This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2018 at 04:20:48 (UTC).

KANG, YOON VS WRIGHT, IRA

Case Summary

On 03/15/2013 KANG, YOON filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WRIGHT, IRA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0267

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KANG YOON

Defendants

WRIGHT IRA

WRIGHT SEANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LONG, HELEN GRAYCE

BOUZANE, JOHN E.

BOUZANE JOHN E.

Defendant Attorneys

WRIGHT, IRA

WRIGHT, SEANA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2015
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • MOTION RULING ISSUED The claim of exemption is granted in that the levying officer is to withhold $250.00 per month. . The levying officer is directed to release one half of any earnings held to the judgment creditor and one half to the judgment debtor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • MOTION RULING ISSUED The claim of exemption is granted in that the levying officer is to withhold $250.00 per month. . The levying officer is directed to release one half of any earnings held to the judgment creditor and one half to the judgment debtor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • MOTION RULING ISSUED The claim of exemption is granted in that the levying officer is to withhold $250.00 per month. . The levying officer is directed to release one half of any earnings held to the judgment creditor and one half to the judgment debtor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • MOTION CONT.: C/E - WRIT OF EXECUTION HEARING SET FOR 2/14/14 no monies are to be released to any party yet.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • MOTION FILED: C/E - WRIT OF EXECUTION HEARING SET FOR 2/14/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • A/C - MOTION FILING REASON: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2013
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED-NOTICE OF REJECTION RE: REQUEST FOR WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • FEE WAIVER FILED -RESPONDENT ANSWER FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • A/C - FEE WAIVER REASON: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • A/C - ANSWER FILING REASON: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • FEE WAIVER FILED -RESPONDENT ANSWER FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • COMPLAINT FILED Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET 04/11/13, 08:30 AM, DEPT 88

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • CMC CLERK'S CERT OF SERVICE GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less