This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/27/2016 at 06:02:31 (UTC).

KANG, JAMES VS WRIGHT, IRA

Case Summary

On 01/26/2012 KANG, JAMES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WRIGHT, IRA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0111

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KANG JAMES

Defendants

WRIGHT IRA

WRIGHT SEANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALLEN, MARIE DARLENE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2015
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL BY COURT'S MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • OSC SET 07/30/15, 0830 AM, DEPT. S12, NOTICE FILED & MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • NOTICE OF REJECTION-UNLAWFUL DETAINER DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • SUBMISSION FOR COURT JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • AMENDED DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT SUBMITTED TO RESEARCH ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2012
  • NOTICE OF REJECTION-UNLAWFUL DETAINER DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2012
  • REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT RE-SUBMITTED TO RESEARCH ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2012
  • SUBMISSION FOR COURT JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2012
  • DISMISSAL ENTERED AS TO DOES 1 TO 10 ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2012
  • DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • DECLARATION RE: DEFAULT BY DEFENDANTS AND REQUEST FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • NOTICE OF REJECTION: REQUEST FOR JUDGMENT. IF REQUESTING JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2012
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less