This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/14/2019 at 04:46:21 (UTC).

KANAMAN LLC VS JONES, LEILA

Case Summary

On 05/12/2017 KANAMAN LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JONES, LEILA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RANDOLPH A. ROGERS and JOEL LOFTON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0759

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDOLPH A. ROGERS

Presiding Judge

JOEL LOFTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KANAMAN LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY CO

Defendants

JONES LELIA SUED AS JONES LEILA

JONES LELIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES - HELEN GRAYCE LONG ESQ

Attorney at H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

LONG HELEN GRAYCE ESQ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # PAID . U.S. MAIL F.E.S. MR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • MINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. A15 , HON. JOEL LOFTON PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: VACATE JUDGMENT AND DISMISS CASE WITH PREJUDICE . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: BASED UPON SWORN TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS, HANS IPSEN, WHO REPRESENTS DEFENDANT HAS NOT VACATED PREMISES, JUDGMENT ENTERED JUNE 20, 2017, SHALL REMAIN. NOTICE PREVIOUSLY WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • MINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. A15 , HON. JOEL LOFTON PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: VACATE JUDGMENT AND DISMISS CASE WITH PREJUDICE . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: BASED UPON SWORN TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS, HANS IPSEN, WHO REPRESENTS DEFENDANT HAS NOT VACATED PREMISES, JUDGMENT ENTERED JUNE 20, 2017, SHALL REMAIN. NOTICE PREVIOUSLY WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • MINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. A15 , HON. RANDOLPH A. ROGERS PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF SUBMITS A STIPULATION AND JUDGMENT FOR THE COURT'S REVIEW. . SETTLEMENT REACHED. COURT TRIAL ORDERED OFF CALENDAR. MATTER SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 07/11/17 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. A15 . A STIPULATION AND JUDGMENT IS SUBMITTED, SIGNED, AND FILED; CONFORMED COPIES OF STIPULATION AND JUDGMENT ARE GIVEN TO THE PARTIES IN OPEN COURT. CASE IS SET FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: VACATE JUDGMENT AND DISMISS CASE, SEE MINUTES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 06/20/17 , FOR (KANAMAN LLC) A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY CO , AGAINST (JONES, LELIA) SUED AS (JONES, LEILA) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 45531 CORKWOOD AVE LANCASTER, CA 93534 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46. ** A WRIT OF POSSESSION MAY BE ISSUED FORTHWITH, BUT NO FINAL LOCKOUT MAY PROCEED BEFORE JULY 2, 2017 ** ** CASE IS SET FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: VACATE JUDGMENT AND DISMISS CASE WITH PREJUDICE, ON JULY 11, 2017, AT 8:30 A.M., IN DEPARTMENT A15 **

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • MINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. A15 , HON. RANDOLPH A. ROGERS PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF SUBMITS A STIPULATION AND JUDGMENT FOR THE COURT'S REVIEW. . SETTLEMENT REACHED. COURT TRIAL ORDERED OFF CALENDAR. MATTER SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 07/11/17 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. A15 . A STIPULATION AND JUDGMENT IS SUBMITTED, SIGNED, AND FILED; CONFORMED COPIES OF STIPULATION AND JUDGMENT ARE GIVEN TO THE PARTIES IN OPEN COURT. CASE IS SET FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: VACATE JUDGMENT AND DISMISS CASE, SEE MINUTES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL ON 06/20/17 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT A15 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2017
  • ANSWER FILED OF (JONES, LELIA) SUED AS (JONES, LEILA) . RECEIPT # WAIVER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (JONES, LEILA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED AS TO (JONES, LELIA) SUED AS (JONES, LEILA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE COMPLETED BY HAND DELIVERING A COPY OF THE ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER TO THE APPLICANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN 05. Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. A15 , HONORABLE RANDOLPH A. ROGERS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 11/09/17 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT A15 . .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICE OF JOHN BOUZANE - HELEN GRAYCE LONG ESQ

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LONG HELEN GRAYCE