This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/13/2016 at 11:13:49 (UTC).

KAMJOO, HOTAN VS YOUNESI, HAMID

Case Summary

On 04/06/2012 KAMJOO, HOTAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against YOUNESI, HAMID. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BOBBI TILLMON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0579

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BOBBI TILLMON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KAMJOO HOTAN

Defendants

YOUNESI HAMID DBA H. YOUNESI D.D.S. INC. DBA H

MOORE CAMILLE

RAMOS PAULA

YOUNESI HAMID DBA H. YOUNESI D. D. S. INC. DBA H. YOUNESI DENTALCORPORATION

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE INGLEWOOD COURTHOUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM BH 12S00579 TO ING12SB0579

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/20/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2012
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005 , HON. BOBBI TILLMON PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: CHALLENGE TO VENUE. THE COURT RULES THAT THE VENUE IS IMPROPER IN THIS CASE AND ORDERS THE CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE PER C.C.P. 116.370.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2012
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2012
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2012
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT 005 RE: SMALL CLAIMS COURT HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/04/12 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 005. .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • CHALLENGE TO VENUE FILED BY DEFENDANT(S) (MOORE, CAMILLE) . THE VENUE CHALLENGE WILL BE CONSIDERED BY THE BENCH OFFICER ON THE DATE OF TRIAL. ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CHALLENGE TO VENUE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SIGNED BY ERICKA ZONCE ON BEHALF OF (YOUNESI, HAMID) DBA (H. YOUNESI D.D.S., INC.) DBA (H. YOUNESI DENTALCORPORATION) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SIGNED BY ERICKA ZONCE ON BEHALF OF (MOORE, CAMILLE) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SIGNED BY LAURA URENA ON BEHALF OF (RAMOS, PAULA) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2012
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 1120406E7048. HEARING SET FOR 06/04/12 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. 005.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2012
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FOR SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL ELECTRONICALLY REQUESTED FOR DEFENDANT(S) (RAMOS, PAULA) (MOORE, CAMILLE) (YOUNESI, HAMID) DBA (H. YOUNESI D.D.S., INC.) DBA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2012
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (YOUNESI, HAMID) DBA (H. YOUNESI D.D.S., INC.) DBA (H. YOUNESI DENTALCORPORATION) . RECEIPT # 1120406E7048 . 7006 3450 0002 4640 8177

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2012
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (MOORE, CAMILLE) . RECEIPT # 1120406E7048 . 7006 3450 N0002 N4640 8191

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2012
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (RAMOS, PAULA) . RECEIPT # 1120406E7048 . 7006 3450 0002 4640 8108

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less