This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 00:57:12 (UTC).

KALIKA VS HOLLYWOOD 7 STAR MOTEL, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/01/2015 KALIKA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HOLLYWOOD 7 STAR MOTEL, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM V. MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3041

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM V. MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KALIKA

Defendant

HOLLYWOOD 7 STAR MOTEL LLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2015
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (HOLLYWOOD 7 STAR MOTEL, LLC) . PHILLIP SHU, GENERAL MANAGER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (HOLLYWOOD 7 STAR MOTEL, LLC) . SHUN ZHANG, MANAGER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 10:35A M, IN DEPT. SW8 , HON. WILLIAM V. MCTAGGART PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING (IN PRO PER) . DEFENDANT APPEARING (BY, PHILLIP SHU; AND SHUN ZHANG) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 07/07/15 . FOR (KALIKA) . AGAINST (HOLLYWOOD 7 STAR MOTEL, LLC) . PRINCIPAL $ 2000.00 . COSTS $ 115.00 . TOTAL $ 2115.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (HOLLYWOOD 7 STAR MOTEL, LLC) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM SW8 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (HOLLYWOOD 7 STAR MOTEL, LLC) BY SUB-SERVING SHUN ZHAND, MANAGER . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 07/07/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SW8 COSTS OF $ 40.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN ING502347006. HEARING SET FOR 07/07/15 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. SW8.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOLLYWOOD 7 STAR MOTEL is a litigant