This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 08:55:35 (UTC).

JUNO HEALTHCARE REGISTRY INC VS SAN FERNANDO COMMUNITY HOSPITA

Case Summary

On 07/12/2016 JUNO HEALTHCARE REGISTRY INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SAN FERNANDO COMMUNITY HOSPITA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT J. SCHUIT. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0627

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT J. SCHUIT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUNO HEALTHCARE REGISTRY INC FKA JUNO HEALTHCARE STAFFING SYSTMES

Defendants

DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC

SAN FERNANDO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL INC DBA MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SPENCER & MULALLY - THOMAS R. MULALLY

Attorney at SPENCER & MULALLY

MULALLY THOMAS R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Case Destroyed pursuant to California Government Code Section 68151 and 68153.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (SAN FERNANDO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL INC) DBA (MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO SHELF 1 RE: FILE REVIEWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 06/27/19 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY ROBERT J. SCHUIT, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN CHA625572064. Filing Fee: 370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less