This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2020 at 03:27:31 (UTC).

JUNGWOO LEE, ET AL. VS ROSALIA MEDRANO GARCIA

Case Summary

On 02/13/2019 JUNGWOO LEE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROSALIA MEDRANO GARCIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1483

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LEE JUNGWOO

ROW YOUNG JIN

Defendant

GARCIA ROSALIA MEDRANO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROMLEY DAVID

ROMLEY DAVID EDWARD

Defendant Attorney

BUI TATIANA YOKOYAMA

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

9/9/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

12/9/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/13/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

5/12/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

7/17/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

7/23/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; AND DECLARATION OF IBRAHIM N. MUHTASEB

8/12/2019: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; AND DECLARATION OF IBRAHIM N. MUHTASEB

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Of David Romley In Reply

8/14/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Of David Romley In Reply

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

8/22/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

8/29/2019: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL INSPECTION DEMAND

9/3/2019: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL INSPECTION DEMAND

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

4/30/2019: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Answer - Answer

4/30/2019: Answer - Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/20/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Complaint - Complaint

2/13/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/13/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/13/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

2/13/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/12/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/16/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by JUNGWOO LEE, et al. on 02/13/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by JUNGWOO LEE and YOUNG JIN ROW as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: JUNGWOO LEE (Plaintiff); YOUNG JIN ROW (Plaintiff); As to: ROSALIA MEDRANO GARCIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- David Edward Romley (Attorney): First Name changed from DAVID to David; Last Name changed from ROMLEY to Romley; Organization Name changed from LAW OFFIC EOF DAVID ROMLEY to Law Office of David Romley; Middle Name: Edward

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketAddress for David Edward Romley (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: ROSALIA MEDRANO GARCIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 12/09/2019 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 12/09/2019; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: ROSALIA MEDRANO GARCIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: JUNGWOO LEE (Plaintiff); YOUNG JIN ROW (Plaintiff); As to: ROSALIA MEDRANO GARCIA (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/18/2019; Service Cost: 250.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/12/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: JUNGWOO LEE (Plaintiff); YOUNG JIN ROW (Plaintiff); As to: ROSALIA MEDRANO GARCIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JUNGWOO LEE (Plaintiff); YOUNG JIN ROW (Plaintiff); As to: ROSALIA MEDRANO GARCIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JUNGWOO LEE (Plaintiff); YOUNG JIN ROW (Plaintiff); As to: ROSALIA MEDRANO GARCIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC01483    Hearing Date: December 09, 2019    Dept: 94

Lee, et al. v. Garcia, et al.

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

(CCP § 2031.300)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Jungwoo Lee’s Motion Compelling Defendant Rosalia Medrano Garcia To Respond To Request for Production, Set One, and for Monetary Sanctions is GRANTED. Responses are to be served within 20 days. Sanctions are awarded against Defendant in the amount of $460.00, to be paid within 30 days.

ANALYSIS:

Plaintiff Jungwoo Lee (“Plaintiff Lee”) propounded Request for Production ,Set One on Defendant Rosalia Medrano Garcia (“Defendant”) on May 9, 2019. (Motion, Romley Decl., ¶2 and Exh. 1.) Plaintiff’s counsel extended the time to respond to June 27, 2019, but Defendant did not serve responses by that date. (Id. at ¶¶3-4.) On July 23, 2019, Plaintiff filed the instant Motion to Compel Responses to the Request for Production by Defendant. Defendant filed an opposition on September 3, 2019.

There is no requirement for a prior meet and confer effort before a motion to compel initial responses can be filed. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2031.300.) Further, the motion can be brought any time after the responding party fails to provide the responses. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2031.300.) In the opposition, Defendant fails to demonstrate service of verified responses to the Request for Production on July 29, 2019. (Opp., Muhtaseb Decl., ¶8 and Exh. D.) The verification is undated and therefore improper. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2015.5.) And unverified responses are tantamount to no response at all. (Zorro v. Inv. Co. v. Great Pacific Securities Corp. (1977) 69 Cal.App.3d 907, 914.)

The Court also finds Defendant’s failure to timely respond a misuse of the discovery process. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2023.010, subd. (d).) Sanctions are appropriate under Code of Civil Procedure sections 2023.010 and 2023.030, and have been properly noticed. However, the amount sought is excessive given the simplicity of this motion. The request for sanctions is granted against Defendant in the amount of $460.00 based on one hour of attorney time billed at $400.00 and the $60.00 filing fee. (Motion, Romley Decl., ¶¶5-6.) Therefore, PLAINTIFF LEE’S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO THE REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION IS GRANTED. RESPONSES ARE TO BE SERVED WITHIN 20 DAYS. SANCTIONS OF $460.00 ARE TO BE PAID WITHIN 30 DAYS THIS ORDER.

Moving party to give notice.