This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/22/2016 at 22:52:14 (UTC).

JUNE A GROTHE CONSTRUCTION INC VS AZINIAN, ROBERT

Case Summary

On 08/27/2012 JUNE A GROTHE CONSTRUCTION INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AZINIAN, ROBERT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3001

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUNE A GROTHE CONSTRUCTION INC

Defendants

AZINIAN ROBERT

AZINIAN KARINA

CCA FOODS INC

THE CRISTCAT GROUP INC

CRISTCAT FARMERS MARKET INC

JOHNNY BURBANK INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINSON ANDELSON LOYA RUUD & ROMO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2015
  • WRIT RETURNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED-LA COUNTY-ATTORNEY SERVICE BIN-AB;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • AFFIDAVIT TO WRIT OF EXECUTION AS PER CCP 685.050-FILED-AB;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - FILED & ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2012
  • AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2012
  • NON-APP CASE MGMT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 02/13/13, IN DEPT 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2012
  • CMR CLERK'S CERT OF SERVICE MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less