Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/12/2021 at 00:36:43 (UTC).

JUN WANG VS GUITAR CENTER

Case Summary

On 09/11/2019 JUN WANG filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against GUITAR CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8351

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WANG JUN

Defendant

GUITAR CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

BROWER STEVEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Jun Wang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted scheduled for 03/25/2021 at 11:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Jun Wang on 09/11/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Jun Wang as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: Status Date changed from 03/08/2021 to 03/02/2021; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Filed by: Guitar Center (Defendant); As to: Jun Wang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Decl. of J. Brower ISO Motion for the Order of Deeming the Truth of Matters in RFAs; Filed by: Guitar Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Guitar Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketOther - Request to Open the Court as Soon as Possible; Filed by: Jun Wang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by: Guitar Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jun Wang (Plaintiff); As to: Guitar Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jun Wang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC08351    Hearing Date: January 27, 2021    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Wed., January 27, 2021 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Wang v. Guitar Center COMPL. FILED: 09-11-19

CASE NUMBER: 19STLC08351 DISC. C/O: 02-08-21

NOTICE: OK DISC. MOT. C/O: 02-23-21

TRIAL DATE: 03-10-21

PROCEEDINGS: MOTION TO DEEM THE TRUTH OF MATTERS SPECIFIED IN REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS, SET ONE, ADMITTED AND CONCLUSIVELY ESTABLISHED AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

MOVING PARTY: Defendant Guitar Center, Inc.

RESP. PARTY: None

MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

(CCP § 2033.280)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant Guitar Center Inc.’s Motion to Deem the Truth of Matters Specified in Requests for Admissions, Set One, Admitted and Conclusively Established is CONTINUED TO MARCH 25, 2021 AT 11:00 A.M. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing, Defendant must file and serve supplemental papers addressing the deficiencies noted herein. Failure to do so may result in the Motion being placed off calendar or denied.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of January 25, 2021 [ ] Late [ ] None

REPLY: None filed as of January 25, 2021 [ ] Late [ ] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

On September 11, 2019, Plaintiff Jun Wang (“Plaintiff”) filed an action, in pro per, alleging breach of contract and common counts against Defendant Guitar Center (“Defendant”). Defendant filed a general denial on October 24, 2019.

On September 11, 2020, Defendant filed the instant Motion to Deem the Truth of Matters Specified in Requests for Admissions, Set One, Admitted and Conclusively Established and Request for Monetary Sanctions (the “Motion”). To date, no opposition has been filed.

Before discussing the merits, the Court notes that the Motion is incomplete. Specifically, Defendant’s counsel’s supporting declaration states that it includes two exhibits, but none are attached. Thus, the matter is CONTINUED to allow Defendant an opportunity to file and serve these attachments.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Defendant Guitar Center Inc.’s Motion to Deem the Truth of Matters Specified in Requests for Admissions, Set One, Admitted and Conclusively Established is CONTINUED TO MARCH 25, 2021 AT 11:00 A.M. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing, Defendant must file and serve supplemental papers addressing the deficiencies noted herein. Failure to do so may result in the Motion being placed off calendar or denied.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.