This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/01/2020 at 05:18:56 (UTC).

JULIO CESAR SALCEDO VS MIREYA GARCIA

Case Summary

On 09/28/2018 JULIO CESAR SALCEDO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MIREYA GARCIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA MAY J. SANTOS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4868

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA MAY J. SANTOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SALCEDO JULIO CESAR

Montebello, CA 90640

Defendants

GARCIA MIREYA

Lynwood, CA 90262

GARCIA ARSINIEGA VICTORIA IRIDIAN

Lynwood, CA 90262

 

Court Documents

Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption - Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption

8/27/2019: Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption - Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) SUBPOENA

5/14/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) SUBPOENA

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/10/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Claim of Exemption - Claim of Exemption

9/3/2019: Claim of Exemption - Claim of Exemption

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim)

9/26/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim)

Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination - Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination

4/18/2019: Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination - Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/14/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

10/10/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

4/17/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) ORAP

5/14/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) ORAP

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

12/10/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil) - Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil)

2/11/2019: Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil) - Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil)

Order Determining Claim of Exemption - Order Determining Claim of Exemption (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim) of 09/26/2019

9/26/2019: Order Determining Claim of Exemption - Order Determining Claim of Exemption (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim) of 09/26/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...)

6/17/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...)

Receipt for Exhibits - Receipt for Exhibits

12/10/2018: Receipt for Exhibits - Receipt for Exhibits

Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption or in lieu of Third-Party Claim - Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption or in lieu of Third-Party Claim

8/27/2019: Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption or in lieu of Third-Party Claim - Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption or in lieu of Third-Party Claim

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court), Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination, Application and

4/18/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court), Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination, Application and

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Claim of Exemption: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Claim of Exemption: Filed By: Julio Cesar Salcedo (Plaintiff); Result: Denied; Result Date: 09/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim) of 09/26/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketOrder Determining Claim of Exemption (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim) of 09/26/2019; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketHearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim scheduled for 09/26/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 09/26/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketClaim of Exemption; Filed by: Julio Cesar Salcedo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption; Filed by: Julio Cesar Salcedo (Plaintiff); As to: VICTORIA IRIDIAN GARCIA ARSINIEGA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption or in lieu of Third-Party Claim; Filed by: Julio Cesar Salcedo (Plaintiff); As to: VICTORIA IRIDIAN GARCIA ARSINIEGA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketHearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim scheduled for 09/26/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Julio Cesar Salcedo (Plaintiff); As to: VICTORIA IRIDIAN GARCIA ARSINIEGA (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/13/2018; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Julio Cesar Salcedo (Plaintiff); As to: VICTORIA IRIDIAN GARCIA ARSINIEGA (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/06/2018; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Julio Cesar Salcedo (Plaintiff); As to: Mireya Garcia (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 11/01/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Mireya Garcia (Defendant) to Mireya Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Julio Cesar Salcedo (Plaintiff); As to: Mireya Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Julio Cesar Salcedo (Plaintiff); As to: Mireya Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Julio Cesar Salcedo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Julio Cesar Salcedo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/10/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.