This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2020 at 07:20:55 (UTC).

JULIO BRAVO VS JACQUELINE VICTORIA CERVAR

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 JULIO BRAVO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JACQUELINE VICTORIA CERVAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5080

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRAVO JULIO

Defendant

CERVAR JACQUELINE VICTORIA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

4/16/2020: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

4/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination - Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination

5/6/2020: Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination - Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

5/26/2020: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 01/10/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

1/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 01/10/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

1/10/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

1/27/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/10/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

12/16/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/6/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • Hearing09/01/2020 at 01:30 PM in Department A at 300 East Walnut St., Pasadena, CA 91101; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Julio Bravo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketHearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 09/01/2020 at 01:30 PM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketApplication and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination; Filed by: Julio Bravo (Plaintiff); As to: Jacqueline Victoria Cervar (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Julio Bravo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Julio Bravo against Defendant Jacqueline Victoria Cervar on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Julio Bravo on 12/06/2019 for the principal amount of $4,500.00 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $4,615.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 01/10/2020; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 01/10/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Julio Bravo (Plaintiff); As to: Jacqueline Victoria Cervar (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase assigned in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Julio Bravo (Plaintiff); As to: Jacqueline Victoria Cervar (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less