This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/17/2020 at 03:46:14 (UTC).

JULIO AQUINO VS SUSANA PEREZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 JULIO AQUINO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SUSANA PEREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7021

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AQUINO JULIO

Defendants

PEREZ SUSANA

ANZORA ROSIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERNSTEIN BARRY S.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

10/5/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Complaint - Complaint

8/18/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/18/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

8/18/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketAddress for Barry S. Bernstein (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by JULIO AQUINO on 08/18/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by JULIO AQUINO as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: JULIO AQUINO (Plaintiff); As to: SUSANA PEREZ (Defendant); ROSIO ANZORA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JULIO AQUINO (Plaintiff); As to: SUSANA PEREZ (Defendant); ROSIO ANZORA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JULIO AQUINO (Plaintiff); As to: SUSANA PEREZ (Defendant); ROSIO ANZORA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERNSTEIN BARRY S.