This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2019 at 00:54:07 (UTC).

JUDICIAL LEGAL SERVICES INC VS FOUR-D COLLEGE

Case Summary

On 07/23/2015 JUDICIAL LEGAL SERVICES INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FOUR-D COLLEGE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6413

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUDICIAL LEGAL SERVICES INC

Defendants

FOUR-D COLLEGE AKA FOUR-D COLLEGE A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SMITH LINDA L AKA SMITH LINDA

SMITH ERNELL L AKA SMITH ERNELL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2015
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (JUDICIAL LEGAL SERVICES INC) . MARVIN VICKTER, CEO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWP , HON. RICHARD F. WALMARK PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY MARVIN VICTER . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 11/05/15 . FOR (JUDICIAL LEGAL SERVICES INC) . AGAINST (FOUR-D COLLEGE) AKA (FOUR-D COLLEGE A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION) . PRINCIPAL $ 1665.00 . COSTS $ 155.00 . TOTAL $ 1820.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS. DEFENDANTS LINDA L SMITH AND ERNELL L SMITH WERE PREVIOUSLY DISMISSED. UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (FOUR-D COLLEGE) AKA (FOUR-D COLLEGE A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM NWP .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWP , HON. RICHARD F. WALMARK PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 11/05/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWP . COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS, LINDA SMITH AND ERNELL SMITH. DEFENDANT'S CHALLENGE TO VENUE IS DENIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO (SMITH, LINDA L) AKA (SMITH LINDA) , (SMITH, ERNELL L) AKA (SMITH, ERNELL) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • CLERK`S NOTICE OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM NWP .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (JUDICIAL LEGAL SERVICES INC) . MARVIN VICKTER, CEO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (FOUR-D COLLEGE) AKA (FOUR-D COLLEGE A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION) . LINDA L. SMITH, PRESIDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE RE: CLAIM BEING FILED IN WRONG JURISDICTION RECEIVED FROM (SMITH, LINDA L) AKA (SMITH LINDA) AND PLACED INTO CASE FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE RE: CLAIM BEING FILED IN WRONG JURISDICTION RECEIVED FROM (SMITH, ERNELL L) AKA (SMITH, ERNELL) AND PLACED INTO CASE FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • CHALLENGE TO VENUE FILED BY DEFENDANT(S) (FOUR-D COLLEGE) AKA (FOUR-D COLLEGE A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION) . THE VENUE CHALLENGE WILL BE CONSIDERED BY THE BENCH OFFICER ON THE DATE OF TRIAL. ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CHALLENGE TO VENUE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (FOUR-D COLLEGE) AKA (FOUR-D COLLEGE A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION) . COSTS OF $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (SMITH, ERNELL L) AKA (SMITH, ERNELL) . COSTS OF $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (SMITH, LINDA L) AKA (SMITH LINDA) BY SUB-SERVING ERNELL SMITH - ADULT MEMBER OF HOUSEHOLD . COSTS OF $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # LAV479682027 . HEARING SET FOR 09/22/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWP

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOUR-D COLLEGE is a litigant

Latest cases where JUDICIAL LEGAL SERVICES INC. is a litigant