This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/22/2019 at 00:44:15 (UTC).

JUDICIAL LEGAL SERVICES INC. VS CHRISTIE LEE GAUMER

Case Summary

On 10/09/2015 JUDICIAL LEGAL SERVICES INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CHRISTIE LEE GAUMER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8859

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUDICIAL LEGAL SERVICES INC.

Defendants

CHRISTIE LEE GAUMER AKA CHRISTIE GAUMER AKA CHRISTIE LEE GA

CHRISTIE LEE GAUMER AKA CHRISTIE GAUMER AKA CHRISTIE LEE GAUMER ATTORNEY AT LAW

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - with Prejudice Entire

12/3/2015: Request for Dismissal - with Prejudice Entire

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2017
  • Order "Case File Destroyed per Section(s) 71008 and/or 68152 of the Government Code."; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (CHRISTIE LEE GAUMER) AKA (CHRISTIE GAUMER) AKA (CHRISTIE LEE GAUMER ATTORNEY AT LAW) BY SUB-SERVING ERIC S. - MALE HISPANIC . COSTS OF $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # LAV485216012 . HEARING SET FOR 12/03/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWZ

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JUDICIAL LEGAL SERVICES INC. is a litigant