This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2022 at 05:52:23 (UTC).

JUANA HERNANDEZ VS MANCHESTER AUTOMOTIVE GROUP INC.

Case Summary

On 07/15/2020 JUANA HERNANDEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MANCHESTER AUTOMOTIVE GROUP INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAY A. SANTANA. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4590

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RAY A. SANTANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDEZ JUANA

Defendant

MANCHESTER AUTOMOTIVE GROUP INC.

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Jose F. Oliver Jr.

11/10/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Jose F. Oliver Jr.

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

11/10/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 11/10/2021

11/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 11/10/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

9/23/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 09/23/2021

9/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 09/23/2021

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) (by Sheriff's Department)

8/13/2021: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) (by Sheriff's Department)

Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination - Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination

7/30/2021: Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination - Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

1/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration - Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

1/21/2021: Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration - Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer-Small Claims]

2/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer-Small Claims]

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473))

3/19/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473))

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Citlali Cano De La Cruz

3/19/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Citlali Cano De La Cruz

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

3/29/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/19/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/19/2021

1/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/19/2021

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

8/12/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/15/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

7/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • Hearing03/15/2022 at 01:30 PM in Department 90 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • Hearing03/15/2022 at 01:30 PM in Department 90 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Compliance Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketCompliance Hearing Re: Proof of Payment scheduled for 03/15/2022 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketHearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 03/15/2022 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 11/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 03/15/2022 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Jose F. Oliver Jr. Filed by: Juana Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 11/10/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketHearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 11/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 01/19/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial): Status Date changed from 01/19/2021 to 01/19/2021; Name Extension changed from (Non-Jury Trial) to (Non-Jury Trial); As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/19/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Juana Hernandez on 07/15/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Juana Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Manchester Automotive Group Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 08/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Juana Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Manchester Automotive Group Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ray A. Santana in Department 90 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MANCHESTER AUTOMOTIVE GROUP is a litigant