This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/17/2021 at 00:16:44 (UTC).

JUAN YANEZ MARTINEZ VS SITA HERRERA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/30/2018 JUAN YANEZ MARTINEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SITA HERRERA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4444

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ JUAN YANEZ

Defendants

GABROUEL ERIC

HERRERA SITA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PEREZ RAYMOND

329 N Rowan Ave

Los Angeles, CA 90063

Defendant Attorney

SCHMECKPEPER KATHY ANNE

 

Court Documents

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

3/1/2021: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

3/1/2021: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

4/1/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Filing Proof of Service

4/2/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Filing Proof of Service

Motion in Limine (name extension) - Motion in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine No. One to Exclude Preclude Plaintiff's Witnesses and Evidence for Failure to Comply with Code of Civil Procedure Sect

9/1/2021: Motion in Limine (name extension) - Motion in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine No. One to Exclude Preclude Plaintiff's Witnesses and Evidence for Failure to Comply with Code of Civil Procedure Sect

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Jury Trial;) of 09/15/2021

9/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Jury Trial;) of 09/15/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Jury Trial;)

9/15/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Jury Trial;)

Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

9/15/2021: Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/27/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Change of Email Address

6/3/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Change of Email Address

Notice of Deposit - Jury - Notice of Deposit - Jury

1/29/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury - Notice of Deposit - Jury

Answer - Answer

1/29/2019: Answer - Answer

Complaint - Complaint

11/30/2018: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/30/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/30/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/30/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

11/30/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/30/2018: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Juan Yanez Martinez on 11/30/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to CCP 581(b)(5)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Jury Trial;)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Jury Trial;) of 09/15/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 09/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 09/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/03/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketMotion in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine No. One to Exclude Preclude Plaintiff's Witnesses and Evidence for Failure to Comply with Code of Civil Procedure Section 96; Declaration of Kathy Schmeckpeper; Filed by: Sita Herrera (Defendant); Eric Gabrouel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH DEMAND FOR INSPECTION AND PRODUCTION OF VEHICLE scheduled for 09/01/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 09/15/2021 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH DEMAND FOR INSPECTION AND PRODUCTION OF VEHICLE scheduled for 09/15/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 09/23/2021 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Filing Proof of Service; Filed by: Juan Yanez Martinez (Plaintiff); As to: Juan Yanez Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Juan Yanez Martinez (Plaintiff); As to: Sita Herrera (Defendant); Eric Gabrouel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/29/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Juan Yanez Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Juan Yanez Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Juan Yanez Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC14444    Hearing Date: April 1, 2021    Dept: 26

Martinez v. Herrera, et al.

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

(CCP § 284(2); CRC Rule 3.1362)

TENTATIVE RULING

Raymond Perez, Esq.’s Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff Juan Yanez Martinez is GRANTED. PROPOSED ORDERS HAVE BEEN SUBMITTED. RULING TO BE EFFECTIVE UPON FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SIGNED ORDER UPON ALL PARTIES.

Moving party to give notice.