This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/19/2017 at 18:43:34 (UTC).

JUAN CARLOS FLORENTINO VS IRWING GAMEROS

Case Summary

On 11/10/2016 JUAN CARLOS FLORENTINO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against IRWING GAMEROS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNABELLE G CORTEZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4673

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNABELLE G CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORENTINO JUAN CARLOS

Los Angeles, CA 90011

Defendant

GAMEROS IRWING

 

Court Documents

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

12/27/2016: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

11/10/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

11/10/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Minute Order of 02/28/2017

2/28/2017: Minute Order of 02/28/2017

Notice of Postponement

12/27/2016: Notice of Postponement

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

2/28/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

11/10/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 02/28/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/28/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 02/28/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Juan Carlos Florentino (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/28/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/27/2016 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 02/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • Notice of Postponement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1161115E1371 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G Cortez at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/27/2016 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: 1161115E1371 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Juan Carlos Florentino (Plaintiff); As to: Irwing Gameros (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less