This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/07/2016 at 10:30:06 (UTC).

JTH PROPERTIES LLC VS PONDER JR, KENNETH B

Case Summary

On 09/04/2012 JTH PROPERTIES LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PONDER JR, KENNETH B. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3224

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JTH PROPERTIES LLC

Defendants

PONDER JR KENNETH B

POWELL MARINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HEANEY, JOHN THOMAS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2015
  • CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 D(1)/GC 68152 D(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HELD, MINUTE ORDER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2013
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL BY COURT'S MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2012
  • OSC CONTINUED TO 01/23/13 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • OSC SET 12/12/12, 0830 AM, DEPT. CHA, RM 1200 NOTICE FILED & MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEANEY JOHN T.