This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/15/2021 at 01:36:16 (UTC).

JOSHUA YADIDI VS TIANA DAVIS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/14/2020 JOSHUA YADIDI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TIANA DAVIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3315

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YADIDI JOSHUA

Defendants

DAVIS CATHERINE

DAVIS TIANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PHILIPS G. HELENA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/14/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

4/14/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/14/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/14/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing for Guardian ad litem re: Joshua

4/17/2020: Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing for Guardian ad litem re: Joshua

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

6/19/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/19/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account - Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account

8/25/2020: Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account - Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Pro

8/25/2020: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Pro

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 12/22/2020

12/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 12/22/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

12/22/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Pro

11/6/2020: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Pro

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)

2/1/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/12/2021

10/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/12/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/12/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Joshua Yadidi on 04/14/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 581(b)(3)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/12/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 10/12/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise scheduled for 02/01/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 02/01/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise scheduled for 02/01/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 12/22/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing for Guardian ad litem re: Joshua; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Joshua Yadidi (Plaintiff); As to: Tiana Davis (Defendant); Catherine Davis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Joshua Yadidi (Plaintiff); As to: Tiana Davis (Defendant); Catherine Davis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: Status Date changed from 06/19/2020 to 04/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Joshua: Status Date changed from 04/17/2020 to 04/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STLC03315    Hearing Date: February 01, 2021    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Mon., February 1, 2021 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Yadidi v. Davis, et al. COMPL. FILED: 04-14-20

CASE NUMBER: 20STLC03315 DISC. C/O: 09-12-21

NOTICE: NO MOTION C/O: 09-27-21

TRIAL DATE: 10-12-21

PROCEEDINGS: PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF A DISPUTED CLAIM ON BEHALF OF MINOR

MOVING PARTY: Petitioner Faryar Yadidi on behalf of minor Claimant Joshua Yadidi

RESP. PARTY: None

PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF A DISPUTED CLAIM

(CCP § 372, CRC, rule 7.950)

TENTATIVE RULING:

The Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim on Behalf of Minor is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

SERVICE:

[ ] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) NO

[ ] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) NO

[ ] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) NO

OPPOSITION: None filed as of January 27, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of January 27, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

On April 14, 2020, minor Plaintiff Joshua Yadidi (“Claimant”) filed an action against Defendants Tiana Davis and Catherine Davis (collectively, “Respondents”) for motor vehicle negligence and general negligence. Petitioner Faryar Yadidi (“Petitioner”) was appointed as Claimant’s guardian ad litem on June 19, 2020. On November 6, 2020, Petitioner filed the instant Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim (the “Petition”) on behalf of Claimant.

On December 22, 2020, the Court noted several deficiencies in the Petition and ordered Petitioner to file and serve supplemental papers. (12/22/20 Minute Order.) The Court warned that failure to file the requested supplemental papers could result in the Petition being placed off calendar or denied. (Id.)

To date, no supplemental papers have been filed. Thus, the Petition is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, the Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim on Behalf of Minor is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

Petitioner is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PHILIPS G. HELENA