This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/02/2020 at 02:19:42 (UTC).

JOSHUA SIMONS VS Z ENTERTAINMENT GROUP LLC

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 JOSHUA SIMONS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Z ENTERTAINMENT GROUP LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0831

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIMONS JOSHUA AKA VAMPR

Defendant

Z ENTERTAINMENT GROUP LLC

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/12/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/12/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

5/12/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 05/12/2017

5/12/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 05/12/2017

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

5/12/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

5/12/2017: Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

RETURNED MAIL - - Notice of Entry of Judgment and Minute Order May 12, 2017

5/26/2017: RETURNED MAIL - - Notice of Entry of Judgment and Minute Order May 12, 2017

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

1/31/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/31/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

1/31/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

2/10/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 04/03/2017

4/3/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 04/03/2017

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

4/3/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- RETURNED MAIL - Notice of Entry of Judgment and Minute Order May 12, 2017: As To Parties: Joshua Simons (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL - Notice of Entry of Judgment and Minute Order May 12, 2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/12/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion to 05/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/12/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 05/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketStipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/12/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/12/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Joshua Simons (Plaintiff); As to: Z Entertainment Group LLC (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 02/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • DocketInvoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: 1170131E8857 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • DocketInvoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170131E8857 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/03/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Joshua Simons (Plaintiff); As to: Z Entertainment Group LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less