This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/08/2021 at 02:41:24 (UTC).

JOSHUA LUCAS JUAREZ VS DAVID AARON SALKIN

Case Summary

On 12/31/2019 JOSHUA LUCAS JUAREZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DAVID AARON SALKIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1802

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUAREZ JOSHUA LUCAS

Defendant

SALKIN DAVID AARON

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

8/11/2021: Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/11/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/11/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) - Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) Brief Summary

8/11/2021: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) - Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) Brief Summary

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service of Statement of Damages

8/11/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service of Statement of Damages

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

8/18/2021: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

8/17/2020: Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

8/17/2020: Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

Application (name extension) - Application Second Application for extension of deadline for service of complaint

9/3/2020: Application (name extension) - Application Second Application for extension of deadline for service of complaint

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Application for Order of Publication of Summons

10/22/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Application for Order of Publication of Summons

Order for Publication - Order for Publication for David

10/27/2020: Order for Publication - Order for Publication for David

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

1/11/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Other - (name extension) - Application for entry of default

4/29/2021: Other - (name extension) - Application for entry of default

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Responses, Without Objections, to...)

5/17/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Responses, Without Objections, to...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Compel Responses, Without Objections, to...) of 05/17/2021

5/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Compel Responses, Without Objections, to...) of 05/17/2021

Order (name extension) - Order For Extension of Deadline for Service of Complaint

6/30/2020: Order (name extension) - Order For Extension of Deadline for Service of Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

12/31/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: Joshua Lucas Juarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Joshua Lucas Juarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Joshua Lucas Juarez against Defendant David Aaron Salkin on the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Joshua Lucas Juarez on 03/12/2020 for damages of $8,000.00 and costs of $350.50 for a total of $8,350.50.; Other: See court order for fee waiver language.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment or Dismissal scheduled for 11/09/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Reimbursement of Costs; Filed by: Joshua Lucas Juarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) Brief Summary; Filed by: Joshua Lucas Juarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Joshua Lucas Juarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • Docket; On the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Joshua Lucas Juarez on 03/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Joshua Lucas Juarez (Plaintiff); As to: David Aaron Salkin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Complaint (1st): Status Date changed from 03/12/2020 to 12/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Joshua Lucas Juarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Joshua Lucas Juarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC11802    Hearing Date: May 17, 2021    Dept: 26

Juarez v. Salkin, et al

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

(CCP §§ 2030.290, 2023.010)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Joshua Lucas Juarez’s Motion for Order Compelling Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set One, and Request for Sanctions is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

THE COURT ADVANCES THE HEARING ON JOSHUA LUCAS JUAREZ’S MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS FROM 05/18/21 TO THIS DATE AND PLACES THE MOTION OFF CALENDAR.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT SET FOR _____, 2021 AT ____ AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

ANALYSIS:

Plaintiff Joshua Lucas Juarez (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action for motor vehicle negligence against Defendant David Aaron Salkin (“Defendant”) on December 31, 2019. A First Amended Complaint was filed on March 12, 2020. On November 19, 2020, Plaintiff filed proof of personal service of the First Amended Summons and First Amended Complaint on Defendant.

The clerk’s office rejected Plaintiff’s request for entry of default on January 11, 2021. Plaintiff filed the instant Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set One, and Request for Sanctions (“the Motion”) on March 15, 2021. Plaintiff concurrently filed a Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted and Request for Sanctions, which is set to be heard on May 18, 2021. Plaintiff filed another request for entry of default on April 29, 2021, which was entered on the same date. To date, Defendant has not filed a responsive pleading or opposition to the Motion.

Discussion

The Court declines to rule on Plaintiff’s discovery motions. Defendant has yet to file a responsive pleading to the First Amended Complaint and Plaintiff is appropriately proceeding to obtain Defendant’s default. (See Code Civ. Proc., § 585.) The Court additionally notes that no copy of the discovery requests is attached the Motion and the number of discovery responses served exceeds the amount permitted in a court of limited jurisdiction. (See Motion, Juarez Decl., ¶2.) Plaintiff served 65 special interrogatories on Defendant when only 35 written discovery requests can be propounded. (Code Civ. Pro., § 94, subd. (a).) Default having been entered against Defendant on April 29, 2021, Plaintiff can move forward with seeking default judgment under Code of Civil Procedure section 585.

Conclusion

Plaintiff Joshua Lucas Juarez’s Motion for Order Compelling Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set One, and Request for Sanctions is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

THE COURT ADVANCES THE HEARING ON JOSHUA LUCAS JUAREZ’S MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS FROM 05/18/21 TO THIS DATE AND PLACES THE MOTION OFF CALENDAR.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT SET FOR _____, 2021 AT ____ AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

Court clerk to give notice.