This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/26/2020 at 02:59:49 (UTC).

JOSE ROMERO, ET AL. VS VERONICA MARQUEZ PADILLA

Case Summary

On 04/12/2019 JOSE ROMERO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against VERONICA MARQUEZ PADILLA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3605

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DURAN JESSICA

ROMERO JOSE

Defendant

PADILLA VERONICA MARQUEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PEREZ RAYMOND

Defendant Attorney

MUHTASEB IBRAHIM N.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/1/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

9/3/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 09/03/2020

9/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 09/03/2020

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS' SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

12/3/2019: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS' SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S FORM INTERROGATORIES

12/3/2019: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S FORM INTERROGATORIES

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

12/3/2019: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

12/3/2019: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS' SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

12/3/2019: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS' SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

Answer - Answer

7/31/2019: Answer - Answer

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) GRANTED

4/16/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) GRANTED

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) GRANTED

4/16/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) GRANTED

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/18/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/12/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

4/12/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/12/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/12/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2022
  • Hearing04/15/2022 at 10:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • Hearing07/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 09/03/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/09/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 07/22/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Veronica Marquez Padilla (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 02/27/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 02/27/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 02/27/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Filed By: Jessica Duran (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 04/15/2019; As To Parties: Jessica Duran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jose Romero (Plaintiff); Jessica Duran (Plaintiff); As to: Veronica Marquez Padilla (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Jose Romero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jose Romero (Plaintiff); Jessica Duran (Plaintiff); As to: Veronica Marquez Padilla (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Jessica Duran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/09/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC03605    Hearing Date: February 26, 2020    Dept: 26

Romero v. Padilla, et al.

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES, REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

(CCP §§ 2030.290; 2031.300)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant Veronica Marquez Padilla’s (1) Motion For Order Compelling Plaintiff Jose Romero To Respond to Form Interrogatories; Request for Sanctions; (2) Motion For Order Compelling Plaintiff Jose Romero To Respond to Special Interrogatories; Request for Sanctions; and (3) Motion For Order Compelling Plaintiff Jose Romero to Respond to Request for Production of Documents; Request For Sanctions are GRANTED.

PLAINTIFF JOSE ROMERO IS ORDERED TO SERVE VERIFIED RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS TO THE INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION WITHIN 20 DAYS’ NOTICE OF THIS ORDER. THE REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IS ALSO GRANTED JOINTLY AND SERVERALLY AGAINST PLAINTIFF ROMERO AND HIS COUNSEL OF RECORD IN THE AMOUNT OF $380.00. SANCTIONS ARE TO BE PAID TO DEFENSE COUNSEL WITHIN 30 DAYS’ NOTICE OF THIS ORDER.

ANALYSIS:

Plaintiffs Jose Romero and Jessica Duran (“Plaintiffs”) filed the instant action for motor vehicle negligence against Defendant Veronica Marquez Padilla (“Defendant”) on April 12, 2019. On December 3, 2019, Defendant filed the instant discovery Motions. To date, no oppositions have been filed.

On July 31, 2019, Defendant served Form Interrogatories, Special Interrogatories, and Requests for Production of Documents on Plaintiff Romero by mail. (Motions, Muhtaseb Decl., ¶3 and Exh. A.) To date, Defendant has not received verified responses to the propounded discovery requests from Plaintiff Romero. (Id. at ¶¶4-9.) Accordingly, Defendant is entitled to an order that Plaintiff Romero serve verified responses without objection to the written discovery propounded by Defendant on July 31, 2019. The Court also finds that Plaintiff Romero’s failure to respond is a misuse of the discovery process. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2023.010, subd. (d).) Sanctions are appropriate under Code of Civil Procedure sections 2023.010 and 2023.030, and have been properly noticed. However, the amount sought is excessive given the simplicity of these nearly identical motions. Sanctions are awarded jointly and severally against Plaintiff Romero and his counsel of record in the amount of $380.00 based on one hour of attorney time billed at $200.00 per hour, and three filing fees of $60.00 each. (Motions, Muhtaseb Decl., ¶9.)

Therefore, Defendant Veronica Marquez Padilla’s (1) Motion For Order Compelling Plaintiff Jose Romero To Respond to Form Interrogatories; Request for Sanctions; (2) Motion For Order Compelling Plaintiff Jose Romero To Respond to Special Interrogatories; Request for Sanctions; and (3) Motion For Order Compelling Plaintiff Jose Romero to Respond to Request for Production of Documents; Request For Sanctions are GRANTED.

PLAINTIFF JOSE ROMERO ARE ORDERED TO SERVE VERIFIED RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS TO THE INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION WITHIN 20 DAYS’ NOTICE OF THIS ORDER. THE REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IS ALSO GRANTED JOINTLY AND SERVERALLY AGAINST PLAINTIFF ROMERO AND HIS COUNSEL OF RECORD IN THE AMOUNT OF $380.00. SANCTIONS ARE TO BE PAID TO DEFENSE COUNSEL WITHIN 30 DAYS’ NOTICE OF THIS ORDER.

Moving party to give notice.