This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/15/2021 at 07:49:51 (UTC).

JOSE ROMERO, ET AL. VS NAYELY LOZANO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/10/2019 JOSE ROMERO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NAYELY LOZANO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5480

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROMERO CARMEN

CENANTI MARIA

ROMERO JOSE

Defendants

LOZANO DE LA TORRE JOSE

LOZANO NAYELY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLADKOV SERGEI

Defendant Attorney

KESHISHIAN NATALIE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

2/11/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

1/11/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Motion to for Order to Compel to Answer

8/12/2020: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Motion to for Order to Compel to Answer

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Motion to for Order to Compel to Answer

8/12/2020: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Motion to for Order to Compel to Answer

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Motion to for Order to Compel to Answer

8/12/2020: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Motion to for Order to Compel to Answer

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Answer

8/12/2020: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Answer

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Motion to for Order to Compel to Answer

8/12/2020: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Motion to for Order to Compel to Answer

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Motion to for Order to Compel to Answer

8/12/2020: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Motion to for Order to Compel to Answer

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Answer

8/12/2020: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Answer

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

11/20/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

2/19/2020: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/19/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer - Answer

2/19/2020: Answer - Answer

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

6/10/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

6/10/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/10/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/10/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/10/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • Hearing06/13/2022 at 10:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • Hearing07/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Hearing04/19/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Hearing04/19/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Hearing04/19/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Hearing04/19/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Hearing04/19/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Hearing04/19/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Hearing04/19/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Hearing04/19/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Nayely Lozano (Defendant); Jose Lozano de la Torre (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Nayely Lozano (Defendant); Jose Lozano de la Torre (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/07/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jose Romero (Plaintiff); Carmen Romero (Plaintiff); Maria Cenanti (Plaintiff); As to: Nayely Lozano (Defendant); Jose Lozano de la Torre (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jose Romero (Plaintiff); Carmen Romero (Plaintiff); Maria Cenanti (Plaintiff); As to: Nayely Lozano (Defendant); Jose Lozano de la Torre (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jose Romero (Plaintiff); Carmen Romero (Plaintiff); Maria Cenanti (Plaintiff); As to: Nayely Lozano (Defendant); Jose Lozano de la Torre (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC05480    Hearing Date: February 11, 2021    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Thu., February 11, 2021 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Romero v. Lozano, et al. COMP. FILED: 06-10-19

CASE NUMBER: 19STLC05480 DISC. C/O: 06-07-21

NOTICE: OK DISC. MOT. C/O: 06-22-21

TRIAL DATE: 07-07-21

PROCEEDINGS: (1, 2, & 3) MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF CARMEN ROMERO TO RESPOND TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

(4, 5, & 6) MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF JOSE ROMERO TO RESPOND TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

(7, 8, & 9) MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING MARIA CENANTI TO RESPOND TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

MOVING PARTY: Defendants Nayely Lozano and Jose Lozano de la Torre

RESP. PARTY: None

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

(CCP §§ 2030.290; 2031.300)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendants’ Motions for Order Compelling Plaintiffs Carmen Romero, Jose Romero, and Maria Cenanti to Respond to Form Interrogatories, Special Interrogatories, and Request for Production of Documents and Request for Sanctions are CONTINUED TO April 19, 2021 AT 10:30 A.M. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing, Defendants’ counsel must file and serve supplemental papers addressing the issues noted herein. Failure to do so may result in the Motions being placed off calendar or denied.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of February 9, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of February 9, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background

On June 10, 2019, Plaintiffs Jose Romero (“Jose”), Carmen Romero (“Carmen”), and Maria Cenanti (“Maria”) filed an action for motor vehicle negligence against Defendants Nayely Lozano and Jose Lozano de la Torre (collectively, “Defendants”). Defendants filed a joint Answer on February 19, 2020.

On August 12, 2020, Defendants filed the instant nine discovery motions seeking to compel Plaintiffs’ responses to Form Interrogatories, Set One, Special Interrogatories, Set One, and Requests for Production of Documents, Set One, and for sanctions. (the “Motions”). To date, no opposition has been filed.

  1. Legal Standard & Discussion

  1. Interrogatories & Request for Production

A party must respond to interrogatories and requests for production of documents within 30 days after service. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.260, subd. (a); Code Civ. Proc., § 2031.260, subd. (a).) If a party to whom interrogatories or requests for production of documents are directed does not provide timely responses, the requesting party may move for an order compelling responses to the discovery. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.290, subd. (b); Code Civ. Proc., § 2031.300, subd. (c).) The party also waives the right to make any objections, including one based on privilege or work-product protection. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.290, subd. (a); Code Civ. Proc., § 2031.300, subd. (a).) There is no time limit for a motion to compel responses to interrogatories or production of documents other than the cut-off on hearing discovery motions 15 days before trial. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 2024.020, subd. (a), 2030.290; Code Civ. Proc., § 2031.300.) No meet and confer efforts are required before filing a motion to compel responses to the discovery. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.290; Code Civ. Proc., § 2031.300; Sinaiko Healthcare Consulting, Inc. v. Pacific Healthcare Consultants (2007) 148 Cal.App.4th 390, 411.)

Here, Defendants’ counsel served each Plaintiff with Form Interrogatories, Set One, Special Interrogatories, Set One, and Request for Production of Documents, Set One, on February 18, 2020 via regular mail. (Motions, Keshishian Decl., ¶¶ 3, Exhs. A.) Although not procedurally required, Defendants’ counsel sent Plaintiff’s counsel a letter regarding the lack of discovery responses on March 31, 2020 and on April 20, 2020. (Id. at ¶¶ 4.) Defendant’s counsel states that, as of the date of this Motion, Plaintiffs have not provided any responses. (Id. at ¶¶ 7, 8.) However, she also states that on May 28, 2020, she contacted Plaintiff’s counsel regarding “deficient” responses. (Id. at ¶ 6.) If responses have already been received but are unsatisfactory, then a motion to compel initial responses is not appropriate. Defendants’ counsel is ordered to file a supplemental declaration clarifying the situation.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Defendants’ Motions for Order Compelling Plaintiffs Carmen Romero, Jose Romero, and Maria Cenanti to Respond to Form Interrogatories, Special Interrogatories, and Request for Production of Documents and Request for Sanctions are CONTINUED TO April 19, 2021 AT 10:30 A.M. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing, Defendants’ counsel must file and serve supplemental papers addressing the issues noted herein. Failure to do so may result in the Motions being placed off calendar or denied.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.