Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 15:45:04 (UTC).

JOSE PABLO IBARRA VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/13/2017 JOSE PABLO IBARRA filed an Infraction - Parking lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4296

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Infraction - Parking

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Appellant

IBARRA JOSE PABLO

Los Angeles, CA 90014

Respondent

CITY OF LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORATION

 

Court Documents

Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal

12/15/2017: Notice of Decision - Administrative Appeal

Proof of Personal Service - Notice of Appeal- Administrative Hearing

11/14/2017: Proof of Personal Service - Notice of Appeal- Administrative Hearing

Request for Administrative File

11/16/2017: Request for Administrative File

Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision

11/13/2017: Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision

Notice of Appeal - Parking

11/13/2017: Notice of Appeal - Parking

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/13/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

11/13/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2017
  • DocketHearing on Administrative Appeal scheduled for 12/15/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 44 updated: Result Date to 12/15/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DocketNotice of Decision - Administrative Appeal; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketRequest for Administrative File; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service Notice of Appeal- Administrative Hearing; Filed by: Jose Pablo Ibarra (Appellant); As to: City of Los Angeles Department of Transporation (Respondent); Service Date: 11/13/2017; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketNotice of Appeal - Parking - Citation Number: 4310071021; Filed by: Jose Pablo Ibarra (Appellant); As to: City of Los Angeles Department of Transporation (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Jose Pablo Ibarra (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketNotice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision; Filed by: Jose Pablo Ibarra (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Edward B. Moreton in Department 44 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketHearing on Administrative Appeal scheduled for 12/15/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 44

    Read MoreRead Less