This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/21/2020 at 11:58:18 (UTC).

JOSE LUIS MOJICA DE ASIS VS CARLOS CHAVEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 JOSE LUIS MOJICA DE ASIS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CARLOS CHAVEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2639

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOJICA DE ASIS JOSE LUIS

Defendants

CHAVEZ ARMANDO

AC CUSTOM CATERING INC

CHAVEZ CARLOS

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/23/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

9/23/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2020
  • Hearing12/09/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department 1 at 10025 East Flower Street, Bellflower, CA 90706; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Result Date changed from 09/24/2020 to 09/24/2020; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from AC Custom Catering Inc (Defendant), Carlos Chavez (Defendant), Armando Chavez (Defendant) to Armando Chavez (Defendant), Carlos Chavez (Defendant), AC Custom Catering Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/09/2020 at 10:00 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Jose Luis Mojica De Asis (Plaintiff); As to: Carlos Chavez (Defendant); Armando Chavez (Defendant); AC Custom Catering Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Jose Luis Mojica De Asis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Jose Luis Mojica De Asis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less