This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2021 at 01:29:41 (UTC).

JOSE LUIS GARCIA VS TRINIDAD HERNANDEZ SOLIS

Case Summary

On 09/19/2018 JOSE LUIS GARCIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TRINIDAD HERNANDEZ SOLIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1920

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA JOSE LUIS

Defendant

SOLIS TRINIDAD HERNANDEZ AKA TRINIDAD CRUZ SOLIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RODRIGUEZ ANTONIO HERNANDEZ

RODRIGUEZ ANTONIO HERNANDEZ ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service;) of 09/22/2021

9/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service;) of 09/22/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service;)

9/22/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service;)

Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

9/22/2021: Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

Application for Publication - Application for Publication

6/1/2021: Application for Publication - Application for Publication

Exhibit List - Exhibit List

6/1/2021: Exhibit List - Exhibit List

Order for Publication - Order for Publication for Trinidad

6/1/2021: Order for Publication - Order for Publication for Trinidad

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

6/3/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...) of 06/03/2021

6/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...) of 06/03/2021

Order for Publication - Order for Publication

7/14/2020: Order for Publication - Order for Publication

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

7/21/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 07/21/2020

7/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 07/21/2020

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/30/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/16/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/19/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - on Complaint

9/19/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Complaint

9/19/2018: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/19/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Jose Luis Garcia on 09/19/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service;) of 09/22/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Antonio Hernandez Rodriguez, Esq. (Attorney): Name Suffix: Esq.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketAddress for Antonio Hernandez Rodriguez, Esq. (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/22/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 09/22/2021; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 /Dismissal scheduled for 09/23/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/22/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 /Dismissal scheduled for 09/23/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...) of 06/03/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 10/06/2020 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/18/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 04/30/2020 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jose Luis Garcia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jose Luis Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: Trinidad Hernandez Solis (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/18/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less