This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/16/2019 at 01:18:46 (UTC).

JOSE CISNEROS, ET AL. VS JOVANNY FELEX GUZMAN

Case Summary

On 08/17/2018 JOSE CISNEROS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JOVANNY FELEX GUZMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3980

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PACHECO EDWIN

West Covina, CA 91790

CISNEROS JOSE

Huntington Park, CA 90255

Defendant

GUZMAN JOVANNY FELIX

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

5/13/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/13/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

5/13/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/13/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

5/13/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

5/13/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

8/17/2018: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Notice (name extension) - Notice Small Claims Reassignment

12/21/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice Small Claims Reassignment

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice Small Claims Reassignment]

12/21/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice Small Claims Reassignment]

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/21/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/29/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/17/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: As To Parties changed from Jovanny Felix Guzman (Defendant) to Jovanny Felix Guzman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): As To Parties changed from Jovanny Felix Guzman (Defendant) to Jovanny Felix Guzman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Document changed from Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) to Proof of Service by Substituted Service; As To Parties changed from Jovanny Felix Guzman (Defendant) to Jovanny Felix Guzman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Jose Cisneros (Plaintiff); Edwin Pacheco (Plaintiff); As to: Jovanny Felix Guzman (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Jose Cisneros (Plaintiff); Edwin Pacheco (Plaintiff); As to: Jovanny Felix Guzman (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 04/20/2019; Proof of Mailing Date: 04/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Edwin Pacheco and Plaintiff Jose Cisneros against Defendant Jovanny Felix Guzman on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Jose Cisneros, et al. on 08/17/2018 for the principal amount of $2,206.75 and costs of $50.00 for a total of $2,256.75.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/13/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/13/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 05/13/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- 02/21/2019 Non-Jury Trial: Location changed from Department SE2 to Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/21/2019 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/29/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 02/21/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/29/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 10/29/2018; Result Type to Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion; Result Type from Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion to Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Jose Cisneros (Plaintiff); Edwin Pacheco (Plaintiff); As to: Jovanny Felex Guzman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/29/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Jovanny Felix Guzman (Defendant): Middle Name changed from Felex to Felix

    Read MoreRead Less