This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/28/2021 at 08:52:40 (UTC).

JOSE ADONO CORTEZ VS VERONICA NIEBLAS

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 JOSE ADONO CORTEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against VERONICA NIEBLAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7983

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADONO CORTEZ JOSE

Defendants

NIEBLAS VERONICA

NIEBLAS FRANK ANTHONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PEREZ RAYMOND

Defendant Attorney

ESMAILIAN ARPINE

 

Court Documents

Answer - Answer

11/16/2020: Answer - Answer

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

9/28/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

9/22/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/22/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

9/22/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/22/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

9/22/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/22/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2023
  • Hearing09/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • Hearing03/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Veronica Nieblas (Defendant); Frank Anthony Nieblas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Jose Adono Cortez (Plaintiff); As to: Veronica Nieblas (Defendant); Frank Anthony Nieblas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jose Adono Cortez (Plaintiff); As to: Veronica Nieblas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jose Adono Cortez (Plaintiff); As to: Veronica Nieblas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jose Adono Cortez (Plaintiff); As to: Veronica Nieblas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Jose Adono Cortez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Jose Adono Cortez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ESMAILIAN ARPINE