This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2020 at 16:46:06 (UTC).

JORGE FLORES, ET AL. VS FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY CORP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 JORGE FLORES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VICTOR M. ACEVEDO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0433

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VICTOR M. ACEVEDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FLORES JORGE

FLORES IRMA

Defendants

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY CORP

PACIFIC RIM CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC.

 

Court Documents

RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL

6/22/2020: RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL

6/5/2020: RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

6/11/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

6/11/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 05/22/2020

5/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 05/22/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

5/22/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/28/2020

5/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/28/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

5/28/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/26/2020

3/26/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/26/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/26/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/14/2020

5/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/14/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

5/14/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

2/26/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

2/13/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2020
  • Hearing08/21/2020 at 01:30 PM in Department 7 at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Filed by: As to: FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY CORP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/02/2020 at 01:30 PM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 08/21/2020 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- RETURNED MAIL: Status Date changed from 04/14/2020 to 06/05/2020; As To Parties changed from PACIFIC RIM CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC. (Defendant), FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY CORP (Defendant) to FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY CORP (Defendant), PACIFIC RIM CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/28/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/02/2020 at 01:30 PM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 05/28/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/28/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/26/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/26/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 05/14/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: JORGE FLORES (Plaintiff); As to: FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY CORP (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: JORGE FLORES (Plaintiff); IRMA FLORES (Plaintiff); As to: FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY CORP (Defendant); PACIFIC RIM CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Victor M. Acevedo in Department 7 Compton Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/26/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.