This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/28/2020 at 00:35:46 (UTC).

JONATHAN NEIL & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS Y.K. AMERICA GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/20/2019 JONATHAN NEIL ASSOCIATES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Y K AMERICA GROUP, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN H. PARK. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8302

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANN H. PARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JONATHAN NEIL & ASSOCIATES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

Y.K. AMERICA GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION FDBA Y.K. AMERICA INTERNATIONAL GROUP INC.

Cross Plaintiff

Y.K. AMERICA GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Cross Defendant

NATIONAL CONSTRUCTION RENTALS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MINASSIAN NATALIA A

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

TKACH JOHN A

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/25/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order- Advancing and Continuing Trial Date.)

4/22/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order- Advancing and Continuing Trial Date.)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order- Advancing and Continuing Trial Date.) of 04/22/2020

4/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order- Advancing and Continuing Trial Date.) of 04/22/2020

Answer - Answer

9/3/2019: Answer - Answer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

7/29/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

7/9/2019: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Answer - Answer

7/9/2019: Answer - Answer

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/9/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/20/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

5/20/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/20/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

5/20/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/20/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Jonathan Neil & Associates, Inc., a California Corporation on 05/20/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Jonathan Neil & Associates, Inc., a California Corporation as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/26/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/26/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order- Advancing and Continuing Trial Date.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order- Advancing and Continuing Trial Date.) of 04/22/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/26/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 08/26/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Jonathan Neil & Associates, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Y.K. America Group, Inc., a California Corporation (Cross-Complainant); As to: National Construction Rentals, Inc., a California Corporation (Cross-Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 05/26/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 to Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Y.K. America Group, Inc., a California Corporation (Cross-Complainant); As to: National Construction Rentals, Inc., a California Corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Y.K. America Group, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); As to: Jonathan Neil & Associates, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Y.K. America Group, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); As to: National Construction Rentals, Inc., a California Corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 05/26/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ann H. Park in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jonathan Neil & Associates, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Y.K. America Group, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jonathan Neil & Associates, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Y.K. America Group, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jonathan Neil & Associates, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Y.K. America Group, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Y.K. AMERICA GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where National Construction Rentals, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where JONATHAN NEIL & ASSOCIATES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TKACH JOHN ANTHONY