Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2019 at 01:14:19 (UTC).

JONATHAN HOPSON VS IRIS MARIELA GARCIA TORRES

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by JONATHAN HOPSON against IRIS MARIELA GARCIA TORRES in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3663

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

PHILIP K. MAUTINO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOPSON JONATHAN

Defendant

GARCIA TORRES IRIS MARIELA

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

11/26/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service (Sheriff Dept.)

3/11/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service (Sheriff Dept.)

Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

2/1/2019: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

2/1/2019: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

11/26/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

1/31/2019: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

2/4/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/14/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

11/26/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Jonathan Hopson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Jonathan Hopson on 11/26/2018, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Jonathan Hopson as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Updated -- Request for Dismissal: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/24/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service (Sheriff Dept.); Filed by: Jonathan Hopson (Plaintiff); As to: Iris Mariela Garcia Torres (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/04/19; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/06/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 04/24/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Updated -- Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): Result: Granted; Result Date: 02/01/2019; As To Parties changed from Iris Mariela Garcia Torres (Defendant) to Iris Mariela Garcia Torres (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Updated -- Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service): Result: Granted; Result Date: 02/01/2019; As To Parties: Iris Mariela Garcia Torres (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Iris Mariela Garcia Torres (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Jonathan Hopson (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Case reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 1A - Hon. Thomas J. Griego; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/06/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Philip K. Mautino in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Jonathan Hopson (Plaintiff); As to: Iris Mariela Garcia Torres (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less