Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2018 at 08:05:58 (UTC).

JONATHAN BAKHSHESHIAN VS ADENA BONYADI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/12/2017 JONATHAN BAKHSHESHIAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ADENA BONYADI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5186

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAKHSHESHIAN JONATHAN

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Defendant

BONYADI ADENA

Glendale, CA 91201

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

3/12/2018: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

1/19/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/19/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

1/19/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/19/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

1/19/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

1/19/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/25/2017

9/25/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/25/2017

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

9/25/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) [Event = HRG000]

7/24/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) [Event = HRG000]

Certificate of Mailing for - [Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

7/28/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

Notice - E-Filing Payment Due

7/12/2017: Notice - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/12/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

7/12/2017: Notice - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2018
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 04/30/2018 ; Status Date changed from 03/13/2018 to 04/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 03/13/2018 ; Status Date changed from 01/19/2018 to 03/13/2018 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 03/13/2018 ; Status Date changed from 03/13/2018 to 03/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Jonathan Bakhsheshian (Plaintiff); As to: Adena Bonyadi (Defendant); Adena Bonyadi (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/19/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/19/2018 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 01/19/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Jonathan Bakhsheshian against Defendant Adena Bonyadi and Defendant Adena Bonyadi on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Jonathan Bakhsheshian on 07/12/2017 for the principal amount of $3,000.00 and costs of $75.00 for a total of $3,075.00, joint and several.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2017
  • Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/31/2017 at 01:30 PM in at Department 8 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party to 09/25/2017 01:30 PM at 09/25/2017 1:30 PM Non-Jury Trial in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Jonathan Bakhsheshian (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: 1170714E9768 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170714E9768 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/31/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Jonathan Bakhsheshian (Plaintiff); As to: Adena Bonyadi (Defendant); Adena Bonyadi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less