Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/22/2021 at 06:50:06 (UTC).

JOHNSON CONTROLS FIRE PROTECTION LP VS AURORA LAS ENCINAS LLC

Case Summary

On 01/17/2020 JOHNSON CONTROLS FIRE PROTECTION LP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AURORA LAS ENCINAS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT SCHUIT. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2745

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT SCHUIT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNSON CONTROLS FIRE PROTECTION LP

Defendant

AURORA LAS ENCINAS LLC DBA LAS ENCINAS HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GABA JR. RODOLFO

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

3/15/2021: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/25/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Summary of the Case - Summary of the Case

8/25/2020: Summary of the Case - Summary of the Case

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

8/25/2020: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

8/25/2020: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/25/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

8/25/2020: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Notice (name extension) - Notice NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

12/11/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

12/29/2020: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

12/29/2020: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings - Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

5/8/2020: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings - Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/29/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Complaint - Complaint

1/17/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/17/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/17/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/17/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

1/17/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP (Plaintiff); As to: Aurora Las Encinas LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment: As To Parties changed from Aurora Las Encinas LLC (Defendant) to Aurora Las Encinas LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 03/15/2021 ; Status Date changed from 08/25/2020 to 03/15/2021 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCase reassigned to Chatsworth Courthouse in Department F43 - Hon. Graciela Freixes; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP (Plaintiff); As to: Aurora Las Encinas LLC (Defendant); County: LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP (Plaintiff); As to: Aurora Las Encinas LLC (Defendant); Interest: 428.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketNotice NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT; Filed by: Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP (Plaintiff); As to: Aurora Las Encinas LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP (Plaintiff); As to: Aurora Las Encinas LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketSummary of the Case; Filed by: Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees; Filed by: Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP (Plaintiff); As to: Aurora Las Encinas LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP (Plaintiff); As to: Aurora Las Encinas LLC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/27/2020; Service Cost: 78.61; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Robert Schuit in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP (Plaintiff); As to: Aurora Las Encinas LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP (Plaintiff); As to: Aurora Las Encinas LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP (Plaintiff); As to: Aurora Las Encinas LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AURORA LAS ENCINAS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where JOHNSON CONTROLS FIRE PROTECTION, LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GABA RODOLFO