This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 20:51:42 (UTC).

JOHNNY PADILLA, ET AL. VS ARUTYUN SARGISIAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/06/2018 JOHNNY PADILLA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ARUTYUN SARGISIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4387

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAMIREZ ELSY

PADILLA JOHNNY

Defendants

SARGISIAN ARUTYUN

VARGAS JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERSHATSKI ERIC S

Defendant Attorneys

DUNKIN CRAIG L

GHENCIU VLAD RAUL

SPRIGGS SCOTT B.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/6/2018: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/6/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - on Complaint

4/6/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/6/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint

4/6/2018: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/6/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - on Complaint

4/6/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Deposition

6/14/2019: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Deposition

Association of Attorney - Association of Attorney

5/6/2019: Association of Attorney - Association of Attorney

Notice of Deposit - Jury - Notice of Deposit - Jury

4/5/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury - Notice of Deposit - Jury

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Issuance of Court Order re: Related Cases

3/25/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Issuance of Court Order re: Related Cases

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order re: related cases;)

3/19/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order re: related cases;)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order re: related cases;) of 03/19/2019

3/19/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order re: related cases;) of 03/19/2019

Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case

1/25/2019: Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case

Answer

10/5/2018: Answer

Answer

10/1/2018: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

10/1/2018: Demand for Jury Trial

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 5 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 5 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • Hearingat 01:30 PM in Department 5 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6) scheduled for 08/29/2019 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketMotion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6); Filed by: James Vargas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition scheduled for 07/15/2019 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 5 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 06/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Deposition scheduled for 07/15/2019 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel Deposition; Filed by: James Vargas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by: Arutyun Sargisian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by: Johnny Padilla (Plaintiff); Elsy Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: James Vargas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Arutyun Sargisian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Arutyun Sargisian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/04/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Johnny Padilla (Plaintiff); Elsy Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: Arutyun Sargisian (Defendant); James Vargas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Johnny Padilla (Plaintiff); Elsy Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC04387    Hearing Date: December 10, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

johnny padilla, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

arutyun sargisian, et al.

Defendants.

Case No.: 18STLC04387 (related to

BC707385)

Hearing Date: December 10, 2019

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

MOTION TO consolidate

Defendant Arutyun Sargisian (“Defendant”) moves to reclassify the above-referenced case as an unlimited civil case and then seeks to consolidate it with another unlimited civil case: James Vargas v. Arutyun Sargisian (Super. Ct. L.A. County, 2018, No. BC707385). Plaintiffs Johnny Padilla and Elsy Ramirez (“Plaintiffs”) oppose the motion for reclassification, thereby opposing the motion for consolidation.

Per Local Rule 3.3, subdivision (g), “Before consolidation of a limited case with an unlimited case, the limited case must be reclassified as an unlimited case and the reclassification fee paid.” (Super. Ct. L.A. County, Local Rules, rule 3.3(g)(3).) In determining whether to classify a limited case as an unlimited case, the Court must “review the record to determine whether a judgment in excess of $25,000 is obtainable.” (Ytuarte v. Superior Court (2005) 129 Cal.App.4th 266, 279.)

Here, Defendant has not advanced any evidence from which the Court could determine if Plaintiffs might obtain a judgment in excess of $25,000. Defendant simply argues that the Court should consolidate the actions for purposes of judicial economy since both actions arise from the same motor vehicle accident. However, that is not the standard for determining whether an action should be reclassified as an unlimited civil matter. In the absence of evidence in support of Defendant’s position, the motion is denied.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Defendant’s motion for reclassification is denied without prejudice. Therefore, Defendant’s motion for consolidation is denied without prejudice. Defendant shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: December 10, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPRIGGS SCOTT B.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUNKIN CRAIG L.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GHENCIU VLAD RAUL