This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 20:32:25 (UTC).

JOHN TRAPPER VS JP MORGAN CHASE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 12/22/2017 JOHN TRAPPER filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JP MORGAN CHASE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6222

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRAPPER JOHN

Defendants

JP MORGAN CHASE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST

SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING CORPORATION

JP MORGAN CHASE F.A.

QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

COUTTS MELISSA ROBBINS

DAILEY STEVEN MITCHELL

JUNG ROBIN H

 

Court Documents

Opposition (name extension) - to defendant's request for judicial notice regarding plaintiff's complaint

2/14/2018: Opposition (name extension) - to defendant's request for judicial notice regarding plaintiff's complaint

Request for Judicial Notice

2/21/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice

2/23/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Minute Order - (Hearing on Demurrer without Motion to Strike)

2/28/2018: Minute Order - (Hearing on Demurrer without Motion to Strike)

Proof of Service by Mail

3/16/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

3/16/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Declaration (name extension) - of Steven M. Dailey

4/16/2018: Declaration (name extension) - of Steven M. Dailey

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other to reclassify) of 04/18/2018

4/18/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other to reclassify) of 04/18/2018

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

4/20/2018: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

4/20/2018: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Proof of Service by Mail

4/30/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause re: Payment of Reclassification Fee) of 05/24/2018

5/24/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause re: Payment of Reclassification Fee) of 05/24/2018

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

9/21/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

10/1/2018: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Proof of Service by Mail

2/8/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

2/8/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Judicial Notice

2/7/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Complaint

12/22/2017: Complaint

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketAddress for Melissa Robbins Coutts (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Melissa Robbins Coutts (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Select Portfolio Servicing Corporation (Defendant); As to: John Trapper (Plaintiff); After Substituted Service of Summons & Complaint ?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketNotice of Reclassification; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketReceipt for Transmitted Record; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 55; Reason: Reclassification

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Payment of Reclassification Fee scheduled for 08/13/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 08/13/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Order to Show Cause re: Payment of Reclassification Fee) of 08/13/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause re: Payment of Reclassification Fee)

    Read MoreRead Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 12/26/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: Name Extension changed from on Complaint to on Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: John Trapper (Plaintiff); As to: JP Morgan Chase National Association (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: John Trapper (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Complaint (1st): Status Date changed from 03/16/2018 to 12/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Complaint (1st): Status Date changed from 03/16/2018 to 12/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/21/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/28/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

' @ ® FILED

J ohn Trapper Superior Court of California 06 tll;er:a}l{]‘(’)g[filtga g;ctg com ounty of Los Angeles %ong Beach. CA 90814 DEC 22 2017 clephone Number (310) 213-8727 Sherri . Ok ™ Francisco Caldera e

Plaintiff In Pro Per

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, CENTRAL DISTRICT

John Trapper Case No.: 178-”_096222 Plaintiff, Hon:

PLAINTIFF’S VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR QUIET TITLE JP MORGAN CHASE NATIONAL

ASSOCIATION; JP MORGAN CHASE F.A.: QUALITY LOAN

SERVICE CORPORATION:

- PARTIES

1. Plaintiff John Trapper (hereafter, “Plaintiff” or “Trapper”) is, and at all times mentioned in this Complaint was, a resident of Los Angeles County, California. 2. Defendant JP Morgan Chase National Association is a company that conducts

business in California.