This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/09/2020 at 22:30:00 (UTC).

JOHN MAHER VS WELLS FARGO BANK, NAT. ASSOCIATION, A CORP.

Case Summary

On 06/28/2018 JOHN MAHER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WELLS FARGO BANK, NAT ASSOCIATION, A CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN J. TOWNSEND. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2442

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN J. TOWNSEND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAHER JOHN

Defendant

WELLS FARGO BANK NAT. ASSOCIATION A CORP.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

9/14/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

9/14/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/14/2018

9/14/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/14/2018

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

9/14/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

9/28/2018: Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

9/28/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

10/18/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473)) of 10/18/2018

10/18/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473)) of 10/18/2018

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473))

10/18/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473))

Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

10/22/2018: Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]

10/22/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]

11/8/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]

Order on Request for Court Order - Order on Request for Court Order

11/8/2018: Order on Request for Court Order - Order on Request for Court Order

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]

11/30/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]

Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

11/30/2018: Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]

12/18/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]

Order on Request for Court Order - Order on Request for Court Order

12/18/2018: Order on Request for Court Order - Order on Request for Court Order

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

7/11/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2018
  • DocketOrder on Request for Court Order; Filed by: Clerk; As to: John Maher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Court Order and Answer: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketRequest for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: John Maher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Order on Request for Court Order: As To Parties changed from John Maher (Plaintiff) to John Maher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Court Order and Answer: Filed By: John Maher (Plaintiff); Result: Denied; Result Date: 11/08/2018; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • DocketOrder on Request for Court Order; Filed by: Clerk; As to: John Maher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketRequest for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: John Maher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by John Maher on 06/28/2018 as follows: Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, Nat. Association, A Corp. does not owe the plaintiff John Maher any money on plaintiff's claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, Nat. Association, A Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/14/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/14/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6 updated: Result Date to 09/14/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: John Maher (Plaintiff); As to: Wells Fargo Bank, Nat. Association, A Corp. (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 07/05/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: John Maher (Plaintiff); As to: Wells Fargo Bank, Nat. Association, A Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Susan J. Townsend in Department 6 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/14/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant