This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2018 at 06:50:03 (UTC).

JOHN ENEA VS ROBERT SHANAHAN

Case Summary

On 06/02/2017 JOHN ENEA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ROBERT SHANAHAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4170

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ENEA JOHN

Pleasant Hill, CA 94523

Defendant

SHANAHAN ROBERT

Venice, CA 90291

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

6/2/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

6/2/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

7/12/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/27/2017

7/27/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/27/2017

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

7/27/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

(Non-Jury Trial)

9/27/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Unknown

9/27/2017: Unknown

[Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]

10/27/2017: [Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]

Unknown

10/25/2017: Unknown

[Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]

11/9/2017: [Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]

Unknown

11/8/2017: Unknown

FILED UNTIMELY

11/15/2017: FILED UNTIMELY

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2017
  • Response to Request to Make Payments (Small Claims) FILED UNTIMELY; Filed by: John Enea (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Updated -- Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims): Document Number changed from ORD160 - Order on Request for Court Order to ORD180 - Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Order on Request for Court Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: John Enea (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Request to Make Payments (Small Claims); Filed by: Robert Shanahan (Defendant); As to: John Enea (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/27/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 09/27/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff John Enea against Defendant Robert Shanahan on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by John Enea on 06/02/2017 for the principal amount of $5,000.00 and costs of $170.00 for a total of $5,170.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/27/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: John Enea (Plaintiff); As to: Robert Shanahan (Defendant); Service Cost: 95.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: 1170605E7113 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170605E7113 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/27/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: John Enea (Plaintiff); As to: Robert Shanahan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less