This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 13:56:29 (UTC).

JOHN CORSO VS TOYOTA MOTOR CREDIT CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/01/2018 JOHN CORSO filed an Other lawsuit against TOYOTA MOTOR CREDIT CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1779

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORSO JOHN

Defendants

TOYOTA MOTOR CREDIT CORPORATION

EQUIFAX INC.

TRANSUNION CORP.

EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN TODD MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

SPIERS CHRISTOPHER KEVIN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

3/2/2018: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/14/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Personal Service

2/6/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/6/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/6/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/6/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - on Complaint

2/1/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/1/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/1/2018: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/1/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/01/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Removal to Federal Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketAmended Proof of Service Re: Notice of Removal; Filed by: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketNotice of removal of action to the United States District Court; Filed by: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Removal to Federal Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: John Corso (Plaintiff); As to: Toyota Motor Credit Corporation (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: John Corso (Plaintiff); As to: Transunion Corp. (Defendant); Service Date: 02/05/18; Service Cost: 59.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: John Corso (Plaintiff); As to: Equifax, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 02/05/18; Service Cost: 59.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: John Corso (Plaintiff); As to: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: Name Extension changed from on Complaint to on Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: John Corso (Plaintiff); As to: Toyota Motor Credit Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: John Corso (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/01/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Christo%er K. Spiers (State Bar No. 300613)

cgaiers jonesday.com

JONES DAY

555 South Flower Street Fiftieth Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071.2300

Telephone: +1.213.489.3939 Facsimile: +1.213.243.2539

Attorneys for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

® ORIGINAL

Superior Court of Californis Countv of Lac A noeles

MAR 142018

SherriR, arter, Execunve i vierk of Coury B Y%é » Deputy

Judi Lara

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, (LIMITED JURISDICTION)

JOHN CORSO, Plaintiff, V.

TOYOTA MOTOR CREDIT

CORPORATION: EQUIFAX, INC.:

EXPERIAN INFO TION

SOLUTIONS, INC.; TRANSUNIION CORP.; and Does 1-10,

Defendant.

NAI-1503518205v1

Case No. 18STLC01779

Removed to the United States District ourt, Central District of California Case No. 2:18-¢cv-01785-DMG-JPR

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE

RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF

ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA

Complaint Filed: February 1, 2018

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE