Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2019 at 01:24:52 (UTC).

JOHN ANDREW CASILLAS VS JHH MOTOR CARS, INC

Case Summary

On 09/10/2018 JOHN ANDREW CASILLAS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JHH MOTOR CARS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ASHFAQ G. CHOWDHURY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1332

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ASHFAQ G. CHOWDHURY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASILLAS JOHN ANDREW

Defendant

JHH MOTOR CARS INC DBA SIERRA TOYOTA SCION

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/30/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial is continued and) of 01/08/2019

1/8/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial is continued and) of 01/08/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial is continued and)

1/8/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial is continued and)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/10/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial is continued and scheduled for 01/08/2019 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial is continued and)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial is continued and) of 01/08/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by John Andrew Casillas on 09/10/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to lack of prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial is continued and scheduled for 01/08/2019 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22 updated: Result Date to 10/30/2018; Result Type to Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: John Andrew Casillas (Plaintiff); As to: JHH Motor Cars, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Ashfaq G. Chowdhury in Department A22 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JHH MOTOR CARS INC. DBA SIERRA TOYOTA SCION is a litigant