This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 at 13:40:02 (UTC).

JOEL LAMONT WILLIAMS, ET AL. VS MAUREEN RINKER

Case Summary

On 03/17/2017 JOEL LAMONT WILLIAMS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MAUREEN RINKER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2264

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILLIAMS MEGAN

Marina Del Rey, CA 90292

WILLIAMS JOEL LAMONT

Marina Del Rey, CA 90292

Defendant

RINKER MAUREEN DBA ALLEY CATS PRESCHOOL LLC

Marina Del Rey, CA 90292

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

4/3/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

3/17/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/17/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

3/17/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Unknown

9/26/2017: Unknown

Unknown

9/21/2017: Unknown

Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 09/21/2017

9/21/2017: Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 09/21/2017

(Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

9/21/2017: (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

Unknown

9/19/2017: Unknown

[Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]

9/19/2017: [Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]

Unknown

8/28/2017: Unknown

Unknown

7/27/2017: Unknown

[Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination]

8/2/2017: [Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination]

RETURNED MAIL - ( notice of entry of judgment )

5/31/2017: RETURNED MAIL - ( notice of entry of judgment )

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

5/18/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order of 05/18/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

5/18/2017: Minute Order of 05/18/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/18/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2017
  • RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Megan Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 09/21/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims): Result: Vacated; Result Date: 09/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 09/21/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 09/21/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Updated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Joel Lamont Williams, et al. on 03/17/2017, judgment entered on 05/18/2017 is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Joel Lamont Williams, et al. on 03/17/2017, judgment entered on 05/18/2017 as to Maureen Rinker is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Small Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Request to Make Payments (Small Claims); Filed by: Maureen Rinker (Defendant); As to: Joel Lamont Williams (Plaintiff); Megan Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Megan Williams; Plaintiff Joel Lamont Williams against Defendant Maureen Rinker DBA Alley Cats Preschool LLC on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Joel Lamont Williams, et al. on 03/17/2017 for the principal amount of $1,500.00 and costs of $100.00 for a total of $1,600.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Joel Lamont Williams (Plaintiff); Megan Williams (Plaintiff); As to: Maureen Rinker (Defendant); Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: 1170322E0142 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170322E0142 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/18/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Joel Lamont Williams (Plaintiff); Megan Williams (Plaintiff); As to: Maureen Rinker (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less