This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2018 at 20:13:05 (UTC).

JOE BOY BARRERA VS FAUSTO RAFAEL RIVERA-HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 09/22/2017 JOE BOY BARRERA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FAUSTO RAFAEL RIVERA-HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL L. LOFTON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1488

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOEL L. LOFTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARRERA JOE BOY

Los Angeles, CA 90065

Defendant

RIVERA-HERNANDEZ FAUSTO RAFAEL

Sun Valley, CA 91353

 

Court Documents

Unknown

1/2/2018: Unknown

[Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment, Notice of Small Claims Appeal]

1/2/2018: [Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment, Notice of Small Claims Appeal]

Unknown

1/2/2018: Unknown

Unknown

11/29/2017: Unknown

Unknown

11/29/2017: Unknown

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/29/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

11/29/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/29/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

(Non-Jury Trial)

11/29/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Unknown

10/24/2017: Unknown

Unknown

9/22/2017: Unknown

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal) of 03/20/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 03/20/2018 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22 updated: Result Date to 03/20/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 03/20/2018 ; Principal changed from 3,950.00 to 4,724.00 ; Status Date changed from 11/29/2017 to 03/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Pursuant to the request of defendant, Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 02/01/2018 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 03/20/2018 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment; Filed by: Fausto Rafael Rivera-Hernandez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Notice of Small Claims Appeal; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment, Notice of Small Claims Appeal]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Joe Boy Barrera against Defendant Fausto Rafael Rivera-Hernandez on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Joe Boy Barrera on 09/22/2017 for the principal amount of $3,950.00 and costs of $90.00 for a total of $4,040.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Address for Fausto Rafael Rivera-Hernandez (Defendant) customer request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Fausto Rafael Rivera-Hernandez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 02/01/2018 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 03/20/2018 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Joe Boy Barrera (Plaintiff); As to: Fausto Rafael Rivera-Hernandez (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 10/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Joe Boy Barrera (Plaintiff); As to: Fausto Rafael Rivera-Hernandez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Joel L. Lofton in Department A22 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/21/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/21/2017 at 08:30 AM in at Department A22 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 11/29/2017 08:30 AM at 11/29/2017 8:30 AM Non-Jury Trial in Department A22

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.