This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2018 at 00:14:00 (UTC).

JMS A.C & HEATING & APPLIANCE VS ISAAC, TZACK

Case Summary

On 02/22/2013 JMS A C HEATING APPLIANCE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ISAAC, TZACK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JEFFREY WINIKOW and KENJI MACHIDA. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1625

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JEFFREY WINIKOW

KENJI MACHIDA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JMS A.C & HEATING & APPLIANCE INC.

JMS A. C & HEATING & APPLIANCE INC.

Defendant

ISAAC TZACK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (ISAAC, TZACK) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 , HON. JEFFREY WINIKOW, JUDGE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (JMS A.C & HEATING & APPLIANCE INC.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 07/29/13 . FOR (JMS A.C & HEATING & APPLIANCE INC.) . AGAINST (ISAAC, TZACK) . PRINCIPAL $ 3130.00 . COSTS $ 85.00 . TOTAL $ 3215.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (JMS A.C & HEATING & APPLIANCE INC.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (JMS A.C & HEATING & APPLIANCE INC.) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/18/13 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 . COSTS OF $ 50.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 , HON. KENJI MACHIDA, JUDGE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 07/29/13 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 . SHORT SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO A RESIDENT / PERSON IN CHARGE . COSTS OF $ 50.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAC448311003. HEARING SET FOR 04/18/13 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. 090.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JMS A/C & HEATING is a litigant