This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2018 at 07:26:23 (UTC).

JJL MACHINE SHOP INC. VS SELECT STREET SWEEPING/GUY GORDY

Case Summary

On 10/19/2017 JJL MACHINE SHOP INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SELECT STREET SWEEPING/GUY GORDY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0697

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JJL MACHINE SHOP INC. DBA ALAMEDA MOTOR

539 E Carlin Ave.

Compton, CA 90222

Defendants

GORDY GUY DBA SELECT STREET SWEEPING

Chino, CA 91710

DOUGHERTY GUY DBA SELECT STREET SWEEPING

Chino, CA 91710

 

Court Documents

Unknown

2/23/2018: Unknown

Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 02/21/2018 and ALL OTHER EXHIBITS ENTERED IN DEPARTMENT TR ARE MAILED TO THE RESPECTIVE PARTIES

2/21/2018: Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 02/21/2018 and ALL OTHER EXHIBITS ENTERED IN DEPARTMENT TR ARE MAILED TO THE RESPECTIVE PARTIES

(Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

2/15/2018: (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

(Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

1/31/2018: (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Unknown

12/15/2017: Unknown

(Ruling on Submitted Matter)

12/13/2017: (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

(Non-Jury Trial)

12/7/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

[Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment, Notice of Small Claims Appeal]

1/11/2018: [Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment, Notice of Small Claims Appeal]

Unknown

1/11/2018: Unknown

Unknown

12/15/2017: Unknown

Unknown

12/15/2017: Unknown

Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/13/2017 and Notice of Entry of Judgment

12/13/2017: Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/13/2017 and Notice of Entry of Judgment

Unknown

12/7/2017: Unknown

Unknown

12/7/2017: Unknown

Unknown

11/28/2017: Unknown

Unknown

11/22/2017: Unknown

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by: GUY DOUGHERTY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Updated -- DOUGHERTY, GUY: Last Name changed from GORDY to DOUGHERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • Court orders judgment after trial de novo entered for Defendant GUY DOUGHERTY DBA SELECT STREET SWEEPING against Plaintiff JJL MACHINE SHOP INC. DBA ALAMEDA MOTOR on the Defendant's Claim filed by GUY GORDY on 11/21/2017 for the principal amount of $4,070.00 for a total of $4,070.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • Updated -- On the Defendant's Claim filed by GUY GORDY on 11/21/2017, judgment entered on 12/13/2017 is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • On the Defendant's Claim filed by GUY GORDY on 11/21/2017, judgment entered on 12/13/2017 as to JJL MACHINE SHOP INC. is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 02/21/2018 and ALL OTHER EXHIBITS ENTERED IN DEPARTMENT TR ARE MAILED TO THE RESPECTIVE PARTIES; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 02/15/2018 at 11:00 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department TR updated: Result Date to 02/15/2018; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2017
  • Receipt for Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/07/2017 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 updated: Result Date to 12/07/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: GUY GORDY (Defendant); As to: JJL MACHINE SHOP INC. (Plaintiff); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 11/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: JJL MACHINE SHOP INC. (Plaintiff); As to: GUY GORDY (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 11/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims); Filed by: GUY GORDY (Defendant); As to: JJL MACHINE SHOP INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: JJL MACHINE SHOP INC. (Plaintiff); As to: SELECT STREET SWEEPING/GUY GORDY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Case assigned to in Department 7 Compton Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/07/2017 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Updated -- GUY GORDY (Defendant): First Name: GUY; Last Name: GORDY; Organization Name: blank

    Read MoreRead Less