This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2017 at 10:30:18 (UTC).

JJJENTERPRISES LTD.-III VS. BRISTOL, ANGELINE

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 JJJENTERPRISES LTD -III filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BRISTOL, ANGELINE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1750

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JJJENTERPRISES LTD.-III A CALIFORNIALIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendant

BRISTOL ANGELINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP - CHRIS J EVANS

Attorney at KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. SHERIFFS . RECEIPT # PAS526117010 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (BRISTOL, ANGELINE) , ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (BRISTOL, ANGELINE) . COSTS OF $ 55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (BRISTOL, ANGELINE) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 05/30/17 , FOR (JJJENTERPRISES LTD.-III), A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP , AGAINST (BRISTOL, ANGELINE) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 611 NORTH HOWARD STREET #206 GLENDALE, CA 91206 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 61.00 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN PAS623737020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 10/30/17 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT NEA . .

    Read MoreRead Less