Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2021 at 13:19:04 (UTC).

JINLING LUAN VS HONGWEI XU

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 JINLING LUAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HONGWEI XU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BEVERLY BOURNE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1364

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

BEVERLY BOURNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUAN JINLING

Defendant

XU HONGWEI

 

Court Documents

Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

2/17/2021: Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]

2/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]

3/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/13/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

11/13/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo) of 01/13/2021

1/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo) of 01/13/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo)

1/13/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo)

Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment - Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

12/10/2020: Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment - Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal - Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal

12/14/2020: Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal - Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

11/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

11/17/2020: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

11/20/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

11/20/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/13/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

11/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/13/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

6/17/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

4/29/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

4/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Court Order and Answer: Filed By: Jinling Luan (Plaintiff); Result: Denied; Result Date: 03/12/2021; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketOrder on Request for Court Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Jinling Luan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Court Order and Answer: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Court Order and Answer: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: Jinling Luan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Jinling Luan on 04/29/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Jinling Luan on 04/29/2020, judgment entered on 11/13/2020 is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Jinling Luan on 04/29/2020, judgment entered on 11/13/2020 as to Hongwei Xu is

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 11/13/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice OF REMOTE APPEARANCES AND EXCHANGE AND SUBMISSION OF EVIDENCE PROTOCOL]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketNotice OF REMOTE APPEARANCES AND EXCHANGE AND SUBMISSION OF EVIDENCE PROTOCOL; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Jinling Luan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 11/13/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Beverly Bourne in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Jinling Luan (Plaintiff); As to: Hongwei Xu (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less