Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/11/2021 at 00:14:53 (UTC).

JIMMY YOON VS RUBEN SORIA CAMARGO

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 JIMMY YOON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RUBEN SORIA CAMARGO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9492

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YOON JIMMY

Defendant

CAMARGO RUBEN SORIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YOO KENNETH

Defendant Attorney

HILL GEOFFREY

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/4/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/26/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/27/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer - Answer

11/27/2019: Answer - Answer

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/11/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/11/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

10/11/2019: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

10/11/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/11/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by JIMMY YOON on 10/11/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by JIMMY YOON as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: RUBEN SORIA CAMARGO (Defendant); As to: JIMMY YOON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: RUBEN SORIA CAMARGO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: JIMMY YOON (Plaintiff); As to: RUBEN SORIA CAMARGO (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/04/2019; Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: JIMMY YOON (Plaintiff); As to: RUBEN SORIA CAMARGO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JIMMY YOON (Plaintiff); As to: RUBEN SORIA CAMARGO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JIMMY YOON (Plaintiff); As to: RUBEN SORIA CAMARGO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HILL GEOFFREY