This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/26/2021 at 05:36:01 (UTC).

JILL CHRISTINE NORRIS AND NANCY JEAN WELTY, AS CO-TRUSTEES OF THE WAYNE ROY ULBERG AND AMELIA JANE ULBERG 2013 TRUST VS MICHAEL J GILL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 JILL CHRISTINE NORRIS AND NANCY JEAN WELTY, AS CO-TRUSTEES OF THE WAYNE ROY ULBERG AND AMELIA JANE ULBERG 2013 TRUST filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against MICHAEL J GILL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8084

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JILL CHRISTINE NORRIS AND NANCY JEAN WELTY AS CO-TRUSTEES OF THE WAYNE ROY ULBERG AND AMELIA JANE ULBERG 2013 TRUST

Defendants

DOES 1 - 10

MICHAEL J. GILL A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

GILL MICHAEL J

GILLPIERSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALLACH JASON

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/25/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

9/25/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

9/25/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/25/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/25/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

12/22/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by JILL CHRISTINE NORRIS AND NANCY JEAN WELTY, as Co-Trustees of the WAYNE ROY ULBERG AND AMELIA JANE ULBERG 2013 TRUST on 09/25/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by JILL CHRISTINE NORRIS AND NANCY JEAN WELTY, as Co-Trustees of the WAYNE ROY ULBERG AND AMELIA JANE ULBERG 2013 TRUST as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: JILL CHRISTINE NORRIS AND NANCY JEAN WELTY, as Co-Trustees of the WAYNE ROY ULBERG AND AMELIA JANE ULBERG 2013 TRUST (Plaintiff); As to: Michael J Gill (Defendant); MICHAEL J. GILL, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION (Defendant); GILLPIERSON (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JILL CHRISTINE NORRIS AND NANCY JEAN WELTY, as Co-Trustees of the WAYNE ROY ULBERG AND AMELIA JANE ULBERG 2013 TRUST (Plaintiff); As to: Michael J Gill (Defendant); MICHAEL J. GILL, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION (Defendant); GILLPIERSON (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JILL CHRISTINE NORRIS AND NANCY JEAN WELTY, as Co-Trustees of the WAYNE ROY ULBERG AND AMELIA JANE ULBERG 2013 TRUST (Plaintiff); As to: Michael J Gill (Defendant); MICHAEL J. GILL, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION (Defendant); GILLPIERSON (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALLACH JASON