This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/21/2019 at 19:18:36 (UTC).

JIANG, YVONNE VS XU, HELEN

Case Summary

On 04/26/2017 JIANG, YVONNE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against XU, HELEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HOLLY E. KENDIG. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5412

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

HOLLY E. KENDIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

JIANG YVONNE

Defendants and Respondents

GAO DAVID

XU HELEN

YU WENMEI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HANG, YVONNE

JIANG YVONNE

Defendant Attorneys

SMITH BRIAN THOMAS

TRESTER FREDRIC WARD

LIN MAXWELL E.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

7/12/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Response (name extension) - DEMURRER

6/9/2017: Response (name extension) - DEMURRER

Motion re: (name extension)

6/23/2017: Motion re: (name extension)

Minute Order - (Hearing on Demurrer without Motion to Strike)

8/15/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Demurrer without Motion to Strike)

Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

12/21/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/21/2017

12/21/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/21/2017

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) To Jon Takasugi

10/29/2018: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) To Jon Takasugi

Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

11/5/2018: Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 11/05/2018

11/5/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 11/05/2018

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Improper Amended Comp...)

12/10/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Improper Amended Comp...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 12/20/2018

12/20/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 12/20/2018

Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

12/20/2018: Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition to Helen Xu's Moiton for attorney's fees

3/27/2019: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition to Helen Xu's Moiton for attorney's fees

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

3/28/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Non-Receipt of Opposition to Motion for Attorney's Fees

3/29/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Non-Receipt of Opposition to Motion for Attorney's Fees

Answer - Answer to Second Amended Complaint

4/18/2019: Answer - Answer to Second Amended Complaint

Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

4/25/2019: Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - Minute Order (NON JURY TRIAL)

5/10/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (NON JURY TRIAL)

107 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: HELEN XU (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: YVONNE JIANG (Plaintiff); As to: HELEN XU (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons & Complaint ?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketNtc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103; Filed by: YVONNE JIANG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail FOR APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL; Filed by: YVONNE JIANG (Plaintiff); As to: WENMEI YU (Respondent); DAVID GAO (Respondent); HELEN XU (Respondent); After Substituted Service of Summons & Complaint ?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketNotice Notice of Entry of Judgment in Favor of Defendant David Gao; Filed by: DAVID GAO (Defendant); As to: YVONNE JIANG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketExhibit List Notice of Plaintiff's List of Exhibits K, O, P, Q, R, S Are Submitted with Request for Judicial Notice Also for Motion for Reconsideration; Filed by: YVONNE JIANG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice Plaintiff's; Filed by: YVONNE JIANG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed; Filed by: YVONNE JIANG (Appellant); As to: WENMEI YU (Respondent); DAVID GAO (Respondent); HELEN XU (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
176 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketRESPONSE FILED - DEMURRER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketMOTION FILED: FOR DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT HEARING SET FOR 7/11/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 10/29/18, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketOSC SET 04/27/20, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: YVONNE JIANG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Complaint Contractual Fraud: Status Date changed from 04/26/2017 to 04/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: Status Date changed from 04/26/2017 to 04/28/2017; Name Extension: on Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - CONTRACTUAL FRAUD Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 17K05412    Hearing Date: December 03, 2019    Dept: 94

Plaintiff Yvonne Jiang's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting Dismissal of Xu and of Judgment For Helen Xu is continued to February 13, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. in Department 94.Moving party is to give notice.