This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/28/2019 at 01:13:14 (UTC).

JIA, NATHAN YUE VS STARFLINGER, PETER

Case Summary

On 06/22/2015 JIA, NATHAN YUE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STARFLINGER, PETER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are VINCENT H. OKAMOTO, GREGORY SCHARF, STEVEN L. BERMAN and WILLIAM V. MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4487

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

VINCENT H. OKAMOTO

GREGORY SCHARF

STEVEN L. BERMAN

WILLIAM V. MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JIA NATHAN YUE

Defendants

STARFLINGER PETER DBA STAR MANAGEMENT

R22 INC.

 

Court Documents

Order on Request for Court Order - Judgment debtor must be re-served with notice.

7/20/2016: Order on Request for Court Order - Judgment debtor must be re-served with notice.

Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request for Court Order Judgment debtor must be re-served with notice.]

7/21/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request for Court Order Judgment debtor must be re-served with notice.]

Request for Court Order and Answer

7/6/2016: Request for Court Order and Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - ANSWER RE:REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER

7/6/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - ANSWER RE:REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 06/29/2016

6/29/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 06/29/2016

Minute Order - (Bench Warrant Recall)

6/29/2016: Minute Order - (Bench Warrant Recall)

Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

6/3/2016: Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 06/03/2016

6/3/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 06/03/2016

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order Judgment debtor must be re-served with notice.]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • Order on Request for Court Order Judgment debtor must be re-served with notice. Signed and Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: NATHAN YUE JIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for ANSWER RE:REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • Minute Order (Bench Warrant Recall)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/29/2016; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • Bench Warrant - ORAP status updated to Recalled and Quashed on 06/29/2016; As to: STARFLINGER, PETER ( Defendant )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • Invoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $18.00; Balance: $18.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • Payment: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Amount: $18.00 Receipt: IW-2016-0000799 (Check)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Bench Warrant (Civil) ORAP HOLD PENDING SHERIFF'S FEES & INSTRUCTIONS; Issued by: Clerk; As to: (R22, INC.) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2015
  • COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO (STARFLINGER, PETER) DBA (STAR MANAGEMENT) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 08/27/15 . FOR (JIA, NATHAN YUE) . AGAINST (R22, INC.) . PRINCIPAL $ 5850.00 . COSTS $ 90.00 . TOTAL $ 5940.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (R22, INC.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM SW8 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SERVED AS TO (STARFLINGER, PETER) DBA (STAR MANAGEMENT) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 08/27/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SW8 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 1150622E7061. HEARING SET FOR 08/27/15 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. SW8.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FOR SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL ELECTRONICALLY REQUESTED FOR DEFENDANT(S) (STARFLINGER, PETER) DBA (STAR MANAGEMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (STARFLINGER, PETER) DBA (STAR MANAGEMENT) . RECEIPT # 1150622E7061 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where R22 INC. DBA STAR MANAGEMENT is a litigant