Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/18/2019 at 16:29:39 (UTC).

JHPDE FINANCE 1, LLC VS EDGAR GARCIA

Case Summary

On 09/10/2018 a Contract - Debt Collection case was filed by JHPDE FINANCE 1, LLC against EDGAR GARCIA in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5704

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

RICK BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JHPDE FINANCE 1 LLC

Defendant

GARCIA EDGAR

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - NON-MILITARY STATUS

9/10/2018: Declaration (name extension) - NON-MILITARY STATUS

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

9/10/2018: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration non service

10/11/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration non service

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration NON SERVICE

11/19/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration NON SERVICE

Summons - on Complaint

9/10/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Complaint

9/10/2018: Complaint

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

12/10/2018: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/10/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/10/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: JHPDE FINANCE 1, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: EDGAR GARCIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketDeclaration NON SERVICE; Filed by: JHPDE FINANCE 1, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • DocketDeclaration non service; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: JHPDE FINANCE 1, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: EDGAR GARCIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketDeclaration NON-MILITARY STATUS; Filed by: As to: EDGAR GARCIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JHPDE FINANCE 1, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Rick Brown in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/16/2019 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less